Croston v. Healthex Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Tyler Croston
Defendant: Healthex Corp., Pharmerica East, LLC and Keith Kearney
Case Number: 2:2021cv04827
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 12/27/2021. Filed by Defendants Healthex Corp., Keith Kearney, Pharmerica East, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Mounts, Benjamin)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTATION ORDER granting #8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Healthex Corp. answer due 11/26/2021; Keith Kearney answer due 11/26/2021. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 10/27/2021. (agm)
October 26, 2021 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, New date requested 11/26/2021. by Defendants Healthex Corp., Keith Kearney. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Mounts, Benjamin)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTATION ORDER granting #5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Pharmerica East, LLC answer due 11/26/2021. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 10/26/2021. (agm)
October 25, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Certificate of Service by Defendant Pharmerica East, LLC re #5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the #1 Complaint. (Duprey, Anne) Modified text on 10/26/2021 (jlk).
October 25, 2021 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, New date requested 11/26/2021. by Defendant Pharmerica East, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Duprey, Anne)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Healthex Corp., Pharmerica East, LLC. Healthex Corp. served on 10/7/2021, answer due 10/28/2021; Pharmerica East, LLC served on 10/6/2021, answer due 10/27/2021. (jlk)
October 5, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk: A copy of the complaint and issued summons were sent to the named defendants via certified mail. (er)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Healthex Corp., Keith Kearney & Pharmerica East, LLC. (er)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Healthex Corp., Keith Kearney, Pharmerica East, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8516518), filed by Tyler Croston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Signed Consent Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet Attachment, #4 Summons Form Summons, Healthex Corp., #5 Summons Form Summons, Pharmerica East, LLC, #6 Summons Form Summons, Keith Kearney) (Bendau, Clifford) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/28/2021) (er).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Croston v. Healthex Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Croston
Represented By: Clifford P. Bendau, II
Represented By: James L. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthex Corp.
Represented By: Benjamin W. Mounts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmerica East, LLC
Represented By: Anne E Duprey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Kearney
Represented By: Benjamin W. Mounts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?