T.P. v. Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: T. P. and T.P.
Defendant: WYNDHAM HOTELS AND RESORTS, INC, Red Roof Inns, Inc., Best Western International, Inc., American Hotel and Lodging Association, Ohio Hotel and Lodging Association and Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv04933
Filed: October 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
2 Judge: Algenon L Marbley
3 Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by D Patrick Kasson for Defendant American Hotel and Lodging Association (Kasson, D)
November 15, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of Deficiency re: The submitted certificate is not from the highest court of a State. Related Documents: #6 , #8 , #9 MOTIONS for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gregory Zarzaur, Kimberly Adams & Christopher Tisi filed by A. R. Deficiency Deadline by 11/29/2021. (er)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 & #7 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Emanuella Paulos and Kathryn Avila. PHV Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 11/12/2021. (er)
November 4, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8579004) of Christopher V. Tisi by Plaintiff T.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Babin, Steven)
November 4, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8579004) of Kimberly Adams by Plaintiff T.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Babin, Steven)
November 4, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8579004) of Kathryn L. Avila by Plaintiff T.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Babin, Steven)
November 4, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8579004) of Gregory Zarzaur by Plaintiff T.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Babin, Steven)
November 4, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $1000 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8579004) of Emmie J. Paulos by Plaintiff T.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Babin, Steven)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case numbers 2:19-cv-849 and 2:19-cv-5384 ARE related. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison and Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 10/6/2021. (kk2)
October 5, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to American Hotel and Lodging Association, Best Western International Inc., Ohio Hotel and Lodging Association, Red Roof Inns Inc., and Wyndham Hotels & Resorts Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form Red Roof Inns, #2 Summons Form Best Western International, #3 Summons Form American Hotel & Lodging Association, #4 Summons Form Ohio Hotel & Lodging Association) (kk2)
October 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8524902), filed by T.P. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form, #3 Summons Form, #4 Summons Form, #5 Summons Form, #6 Summons Form) (Babin, Steven) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/8/2021) (jlk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T.P. v. Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. P.
Represented By: Steven Charles Babin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.P.
Represented By: Steven Charles Babin, Jr.
Represented By: Emanuella J. Paulos
Represented By: Kathryn L. Avila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WYNDHAM HOTELS AND RESORTS, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Roof Inns, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Western International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Hotel and Lodging Association
Represented By: D Patrick Kasson
Represented By: Thomas N. Spyker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Hotel and Lodging Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?