Stonebridge at Golf Village Squares Condominium Association v. The Phoenix Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Stonebridge at Golf Village Squares Condominium Association
Defendant: Travelers Insurance Company and The Phoenix Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv04950
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses filed by The Phoenix Insurance Company. (Meyer, Kurt)
November 10, 2021 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Phoenix Insurance Company filed by Stonebridge at Golf Village Squares Condominium Association (kk2)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Amend the Complaint and to Recaption the Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 11/10/2021. (kk2)
November 9, 2021 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 Complaint by Plaintiff Stonebridge at Golf Village Squares Condominium Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Remick, Anthony)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Initial Disclosures due by 11/12/2021; Joinder of Parties & Motions to Amend due by 11/30/2021; Discovery due by 5/31/2022; Protective Order or Clawback Agreement due by 11/19/2021; Dispositive motions due by 8/31/2022; Primary Expert due by 6/30/2022; Rebuttal Expert due by 8/1/2022; Settlement Demand due by 6/8/2022; Response to Settlement Demand due w/in twenty-one (21) days thereafter; Case is referred to Mediation in 9/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/28/2021. (kk2)
October 28, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Travelers Insurance Company, The Travelers Companies, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for Travelers Insurance Company.. (Meyer, Kurt)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #9 Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice of Anthony A. Remick as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. By Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/28/2021. (daf)
October 28, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/28/2021. (jr)
October 27, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8560700) of Anthony A. Remick by Plaintiff Stonebridge at Golf Village Squares Condominium Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Johnson, Timothy)
October 21, 2021 Filing 7 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendant Travelers Insurance Company. (Meyer, Kurt)
October 19, 2021 Filing 6 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney Anthony A. Remick. (er)
October 11, 2021 Filing 5 TRAVELERS INS CO ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES filed by Travelers Insurance Company. (Meyer, Kurt)
October 7, 2021 Filing 4 State Court Record. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (daf)
October 5, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 10/28/2021 10:30 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
October 5, 2021 Filing 2 (Copy of) COMPLAINT against Travelers Insurance Company, filed by Stonebridge at Golf Village Squares Condominium Association. Originally filed in Delaware County CPC (daf) Modified on 10/14/2021 (pb).
October 4, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Delaware County Court of Common Pleas, case number 21 CV H 08 0413 ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8526742), filed by Travelers Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - Pl's Corporate Articles, #4 Exhibit B - Complaint) (Meyer, Kurt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stonebridge at Golf Village Squares Condominium Association v. The Phoenix Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stonebridge at Golf Village Squares Condominium Association
Represented By: Timothy D Johnson
Represented By: Anthony Alton Remick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Insurance Company
Represented By: Kurt Donald Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Phoenix Insurance Company
Represented By: Kurt Donald Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?