Johnson v. Dodds Bodyworks, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Harold J Johnson and Harold Jeffery Johnson
Defendant: Dodds Bodyworks, Inc., 6340 E Main LLC, 6350 E Main LLC and Mary L Dodds
Case Number: 2:2021cv04995
Filed: October 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2021 Filing 8 State Court Record. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Envelope) (daf)
November 3, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Mary L Dodds on 10/25/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. (Fortune, Wesley)
November 3, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Dodds Bodyworks, Inc. on 10/25/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. (Fortune, Wesley)
November 3, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to 6350 E Main LLC on 10/25/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. (Fortune, Wesley)
November 3, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to 6340 E Main LLC on 10/25/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. (Fortune, Wesley)
October 12, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed originally in Franklin County CPC on 9/23/2021 by Harold Jeffery Johnson against 6340 E Main LLC, 6350 E Main LLC, Mary L Dodds & Dodds Bodyworks, Inc. (er)
October 12, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND filed originally in Franklin County CPC on 8/30/2021 by Harold Jeffery Johnson against 6340 E Main LLC, 6350 E Main LLC, Mary L Dodds & Dodds Bodyworks, Inc. (er)
October 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Common Pleas Court, case number 21CV5517 ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8535541), filed by 6350 E Main LLC, 6340 E Main LLC, Dodds Bodyworks, Inc., Mary L Dodds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Docket and Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet for Removal from State Court) (Tackett, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Dodds Bodyworks, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold J Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Jeffery Johnson
Represented By: Wesley Trenton Fortune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dodds Bodyworks, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher W. Tackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 6340 E Main LLC
Represented By: Christopher W. Tackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 6350 E Main LLC
Represented By: Christopher W. Tackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary L Dodds
Represented By: Christopher W. Tackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?