Bent Tree Apartment Manager, LLC v. Roehl Transport, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bent Tree Apartment Manager, LLC
Defendant: Roehl Transport, Inc., Leslie Cornelius Johnson and John Does No. 1-3
Case Number: 2:2021cv05041
Filed: October 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James L Graham
Referring Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE by Defendants Leslie Cornelius Johnson, Roehl Transport, Inc. Offer of Judgment (Jurca, Jeffrey)
November 8, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Leslie Cornelius Johnson, Roehl Transport, Inc.. (Jurca, Jeffrey)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: The November 10, 2021 Preliminary Pretrial Conference is VACATED. Initial Disclosures due by 12/17/2021; Joinder of Parties & Motions to Amend due by 1/5/2022; Discovery due by 4/22/2022; Dispositive motions due by 5/15/2022; Primary Expert due by 2/22/2022; Rebuttal Expert due by 3/29/2022; Settlement Demand due by 11/26/2021; Response to Settlement Demand due by 12/17/2021; Case is referred to Mediation in 4/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 11/3/2021. (kk2)
November 2, 2021 Filing 7 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Bent Tree Apartment Manager, LLC. (Segerman, Douglas)
October 28, 2021 Filing 6 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Bent Tree Apartment Manager, LLC. (Segerman, Douglas)
October 21, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by Defendants Leslie Cornelius Johnson, Roehl Transport, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Proof of Rendering to State Court of Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to State Court of Filing Notice of Removal) (Jurca, Jeffrey)
October 19, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 11/10/2021 11:30 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
October 18, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by All Defendants. (Jurca, Jeffrey)
October 14, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND filed originally in Franklin County CPC on 9/15/2021 by Bent Tree Apartment Manager, LLC against Leslie Cornelius Johnson & Roehl Transport, Inc. (er)
October 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Court of Common Pleas, case number 21CV005841 ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8541930), filed by Leslie Cornelius Johnson, Roehl Transport, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Jurca, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bent Tree Apartment Manager, LLC v. Roehl Transport, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bent Tree Apartment Manager, LLC
Represented By: Douglas J Segerman
Represented By: Alexander Charles Karcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roehl Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey John Jurca
Represented By: Sean P Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Cornelius Johnson
Represented By: Jeffrey John Jurca
Represented By: Sean P Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does No. 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?