Smith v. Cook Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: ANNIE SMITH
Defendant: Cook incorporated, COOK MEDICAL LLC and WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Case Number: 2:2021cv05114
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Case transferred to District of Southern District of Indiana.Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. Second Request per USDC Southern District of Indiana (pb)
December 21, 2021 NOTICE - Case transferred from Ohio Southern has been opened in Southern District of Indiana as case 1:21-cv-06692, filed 12/21/2021. (pb)
December 14, 2021 Filing 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-180): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on MDL, this action is transferred to the Southern District of Indiana. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel on 12/14/2021; certified by the Clerk's Office from INSD on 12/14/2021. (er) (Main Document 6 replaced on 12/14/2021- Clerk submitted the wrong document which is now corrected) (er).
December 14, 2021 Filing 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-180): This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel on 12/14/2021. (er)
December 14, 2021 Case transferred to District of Indiana Southern. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (er)
October 27, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Deficiency re: The filing fee was not submitted with the motion. The fee can be paid #online. Please scroll down to the event called, Pay Fees Via Pay.gov to pay the required fee. Related Document: #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Samuel M. Wendt filed by Annie Smith. Deficiency Deadline by 11/10/2021. (er)
October 27, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cook Medical LLC, Cook incorporated, William Cook Europe Aps. (er)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Samuel Mason Wendt. PHV Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 10/27/2021. (er)
October 27, 2021 Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number AOHSDC-8561417 - Related Document: #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Samuel M. Wendt filed by Annie Smith.. (Babin, Steven) Modified text on 10/27/2021. (er).
October 26, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Samuel M. Wendt by Plaintiff ANNIE SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Babin, Steven) Modified text on 10/27/2021 (er).
October 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8558602), filed by ANNIE SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form Summons - Cook INC., #3 Summons Form Summons - Cook Medical, #4 Summons Form Summons - William Cook) (Babin, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Cook Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNIE SMITH
Represented By: Steven Charles Babin, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Mason Wendt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?