Millhouse, II v. Seleshi et al
Plaintiff: Justin D. Millhouse, II
Defendant: Dr. Ermias Seleshi and Annette Chambers-Smith
Case Number: 2:2021cv05210
Filed: November 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #10 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 12/29/2021. (kk2)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification)
December 28, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Justin D. Millhouse, II. (er)
December 14, 2021 Filing 9 Letter from Justin Millhouse II (er)
December 9, 2021 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - re #7 MOTION for Default Judgment against Dr. Ermias Seleshi and Annette Chambers Smith. Plaintiff has failed to satisfy the requirements of Rule 55, it is RECOMMENDED that the Court DENY Plaintiff's motion for default judgment. Objections to R&R due by 12/23/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on December 9, 2021. (jlk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 6, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Default Judgment against Dr. Ermias Seleshi and Annette Chambers Smith. (er)
November 12, 2021 Filing 6 Letter from Justin Millhouse (sem)
November 10, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Annette Chambers-Smith, Ermias Seleshi. (jlk)
November 8, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Annette Chambers-Smith, Ermias Seleshi, filed by Justin D. Millhouse, II. (jlk)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER issued in that The United States Marshal is DIRECTED to make service of process, by certified mail, on Defendants. Plaintiff is ADVISED that he has NINETY (90) DAYS in which to effect service of process, see Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m), and that failure to serve any Defendant with process within this time may result in the recommendation that the claims against the Defendant(s) be dismissed and may ultimately lead to the dismissal of the claim(s). Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 11/8/21. (sem)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff be allowed to prosecute his action without prepayment of fees or costs and that judicial officers who render services in this action shall do so as if the costs had been prepaid. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff and the prison cashiers office. The Clerk is further DIRECTED to forward a copy of this Order to the Court's financial office in Columbus. The Court will conduct an initial screening of the Complaint and will then enter an appropriate order and direct service of summons and complaint on Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on November 5, 2021. (jlk)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 2, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The Office of the Clerk is in possession of all necessary service documents) by Plaintiff Justin D. Millhouse, II. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Indigency, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Complaint, #4 Exhibit A - AH, #5 Affidavit of Grievance, #6 Affidavit of Verity, #7 Statement of Prior Civil Litigation History, #8 Summons Form, #9 USM Form) (er)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Millhouse, II v. Seleshi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin D. Millhouse, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Ermias Seleshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annette Chambers-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?