Rodriguez Morant v. Moyer et al
Plaintiff: Cornelius Rodriguez Morant
Defendant: Vanessa Moyer, Cornell L. Birden, John Glen Murphy and John Glenn Murphy
Case Number: 2:2021cv05211
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and Order issued in that Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. It is RECOMMENDED that the Court DISMISS Plaintiff's Complaint in its entirety pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and 1915A. Objections to R&R due by 12/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 12/16/21. (sem)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 16, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Cornelius Rodriguez Morant. (sem)
December 16, 2021 This entry is for statistical purposes only. Please see ECF No. #6 for the document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 12/16/21. (sem)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 6, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing (Exhibits) by Plaintiff Cornelius Rodriguez Morant. (er)
November 10, 2021 Filing 3 Civil cover sheet, Summons and Marshal forms by Cornelius Rodriguez Morant. (Attachments: #1 USM forms) (er)
November 5, 2021 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE to the Plaintiff. (er)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 3, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The following document(s) were not submitted to the Office of the Clerk: Summons forms and Civil Cover Sheet) by Plaintiff Cornelius Rodriguez Morant. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 USM forms) (er)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez Morant v. Moyer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornelius Rodriguez Morant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanessa Moyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornell L. Birden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Glen Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Glenn Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?