Bristol v. Davol, Inc. and C.R. Bard, Inc.
Plaintiff: Christopher Kenton Bristol
Defendant: Davol, Inc. and C.R. Bard, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv05389
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2021 Filing 5 Short Form ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Davol, Inc. and C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Kloss, William)
November 22, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to C.R. Bard, Inc. by Plaintiff Christopher Kenton Bristol. Waiver of Service due by 12/23/2021. (Bristol, Christopher)
November 22, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Davol, Inc. by Plaintiff Christopher Kenton Bristol. Waiver of Service due by 12/23/2021. (Bristol, Christopher)
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by Plaintiff Christopher Kenton Bristol re #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet (Bristol, Christopher)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Christopher Kenton Bristol ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8600241), filed by Christopher Kenton Bristol. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bristol, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bristol v. Davol, Inc. and C.R. Bard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Kenton Bristol
Represented By: Christopher Ryan Bristol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davol, Inc. and C.R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: William Darrell Kloss, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?