Reitmire v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Corey Reitmire
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2021cv05899
Filed: December 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2022 Filing 6 First CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by Defendant Statement of Errors due by 4/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 Court Transcript, #2 Documents Related to Administrative Process, #3 Payment Documents and Decisions, #4 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, #5 Non Disability Related Developments, #6 Disability Related Developments, #7 Medical Records Part 1, #8 Medical Records Part 2, #9 Medical Records Part 3) (Stark, John)
January 4, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam R. Sorkin for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Sorkin, Adam)
December 28, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Corey Reitmire (kk2)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Certified administrative record due sixty (60) days after filing of the Complaint and SS Identification Form; Plaintiff's statement of errors due forty-five (45) days after filing of the administrative record; Defendant's response in opposition due forty-five (45) days after service of the Statement of Errors; Plaintiff may reply fifteen (15) days thereafter. The parties should execute and file the attached Notice and Consent form within thirty (30) days after the administrative record is filed if they consent to disposition of this case by the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 12/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent Form) (kk2)
December 28, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Commissioner of Social Security answer due 2/28/2022 (kk2)
December 23, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Corey Reitmire. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Yocum, Mindy) (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/27/2021) (kk2). Modified on 12/27/2021 to flatten and replace civil cover sheet (kk2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reitmire v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Reitmire
Represented By: Mindy Yocum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Represented By: Adam R. Sorkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?