Schnipke v. Kemba Financial Credit Union, Inc.
Plaintiff: Eric Schnipke
Defendant: Kemba Financial Credit Union, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv00004
Filed: January 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James L Graham
Referring Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/9/2022 is VACATED. Initial Disclosures due by 3/18/2022; Joinder of Parties & Motions to Amend due by 3/18/2022; Discovery due by 12/22/2022; Protective Order or Clawback Agreement due by 3/25/2022; Dispositive motions due by 1/20/2023; Case is referred to Mediation in 8/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 2/17/2022. (kk2)
February 16, 2022 Filing 7 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendant Kemba Financial Credit Union, Inc.. (Hushion, Michael)
February 7, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 3/9/2022 10:30 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
January 27, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Kemba Financial Credit Union, Inc.. (Hushion, Michael)
January 27, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Kent Hushion for Defendant Kemba Financial Credit Union, Inc. (Hushion, Michael)
January 24, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Kemba Financial Credit Union, Inc. answer due 3/7/2022. (er)
January 21, 2022 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. (Hushion, Michael)
January 4, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kemba Financial Credit Union, Inc. (ds)
January 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8656766), filed by Eric Schnipke. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form Summons x2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A Right to Sue) (Filippelli, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schnipke v. Kemba Financial Credit Union, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Schnipke
Represented By: Paul Filippelli
Represented By: Trisha M. Breedlove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kemba Financial Credit Union, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Kent Hushion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?