Wanjiku Pearson v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jane Wanjiku Pearson
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company and Nationwide Sales Solutions
Not Classified By Court: Daniel F Ryan
Case Number: 2:2022cv00011
Filed: January 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2022 NOTICE DESIGNATING MEDIATOR: Daniel F Ryan assigned as mediator to this case. Within 14 days, the mediator and parties will confer to set a date, time, and location for mediation in April 2022, or within 60 days of this notice. The mediator will then file a Notice Setting Mediation. (kk2)
February 18, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE: Counsel shall confer and notify the Court at #ADR@ohsd.uscourts.gov within 10 days if this case should NOT proceed with mediation in April 2022. If the case should not proceed, counsel shall indicate whether the case should be continued to another month and, if so, which one. Deadline for notifying the court is 4:00pm on 2/28/2022. (kk2)In light of the COVID-19 pandemic, the parties and mediators are ENCOURAGED to attempt mediation via telephone or video conference.
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 4/4/2022. Motions to Amend due by 4/4/2022. Initial Disclosures due by 3/1/2022. Discovery due by 10/28/2022. Clawback Agreement Deadline due by 3/11/2022. Dispositive motions due by 12/2/2022. Response to Settlement Demand due by 3/18/2022. Mediation Deadline: 4/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on February 15, 2022. (jlk)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 15, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers: Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 2/15/2022. (sln)
February 14, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE by Plaintiff Jane Wanjiku Pearson re #8 Response (non motion), #13 Order, #12 Notice (Other) (Pearson, Jane)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - Re #12 Notice (Other) filed by Jane Wanjiku Pearson. The Court STRIKES this filing and DIRECTS the parties to cease filing settlement offers or demands on the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on February 14, 2022. (jlk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 11, 2022 Filing 12 STRICKEN PER ORDER #13 ***NOTICE of Settlement Demand by Plaintiff Jane Wanjiku Pearson (Pearson, Jane) Modified text on 2/14/2022 (sln). Modified on 2/14/2022 (jlk).
February 2, 2022 Filing 11 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendants Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Sales Solutions. (Kathumbi, Lisa)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for electronic filing rights. The Court STRIKES Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss, Reply to Defendant's Defense and Answer to Counterclaim, ECF No. 8, as not permitted under the applicable rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on January 21, 2022. (jlk)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 20, 2022 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Delaware County Common Pleas Court on 1/13/2022 re: return of State Court Record (kk2)
January 20, 2022 Filing 8 STRICKEN PER #10 ORDER***Response in Opposition re #6 Answer to Complaint by Plaintiff Jane Wanjiku Pearson (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kk2) Modified on 1/21/2022 (jlk).
January 20, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Obtain Electronic Filing Rights by Plaintiff Jane Wanjiku Pearson (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kk2)
January 11, 2022 Filing 6 Defendants' ANSWER to #2 Complaint filed by All Defendants. (Kathumbi, Lisa)
January 10, 2022 Filing 4 State Court Record received from Delaware County Common Pleas Court (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kk2)
January 4, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed originally in Delaware County CPC on 12/13/2021 with Jury Demand by Jane Wanjiku Pearson against Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (er)
January 4, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Delaware County Common Pleas, case number 21 CV H 12 0554 ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8658103), filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pleadings in State Court Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Kathumbi, Lisa) (Attachments 2 & 3 replaced by the Clerk on 1/4/2022- counsel, fillable documents must be flattened before filing) (er).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wanjiku Pearson v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Wanjiku Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Lisa Kathumbi
Represented By: Judson Severn Millhon, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Sales Solutions
Represented By: Lisa Kathumbi
Represented By: Judson Severn Millhon, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Daniel F Ryan
Represented By: Daniel Francis Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?