Allen et al v. Becerra
Plaintiff: John Dale Allen and Roger Carlton Johnson
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Case Number: 2:2022cv00020
Filed: January 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2022 Filing 9 Letter from John Dale Allen and Roger Carlton Johnson (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tla)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Opinion and Order signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 2/8/2022. (cw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, OVERRULING Plaintiffs' Objections. This case is DISMISSED. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 2/8/2022. (cw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 18, 2022 Filing 6 OBJECTION to #4 Report and Recommendations by Plaintiffs John Dale Allen, Roger Carlton Johnson. (jlk)
January 12, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (er)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 Complaint filed by Roger Carlton Johnson, John Dale Allen. Plaintiffs' Motions for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (ECF Nos. #1 - #2 ) are GRANTED. Furthermore it is RECOMMENDED that Plaintiffs' claims be DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Objections to R&R due by 1/25/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 1/11/2022. (daf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 11, 2022 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Xavier Becerra, filed by John Dale Allen, Roger Carlton Johnson. (daf)
January 11, 2022 This entry is for statistical purposes only. See ECF No. #4 for the document. (daf)
January 5, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The following document(s) were not submitted to the Office of the Clerk: Service Complaints, Summons forms) by Plaintiff Roger Carlton Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Env.) (jlk)
January 5, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The following document(s) were not submitted to the Office of the Clerk: Service Complaints, Summons forms) by Plaintiff John Dale Allen. (jlk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen et al v. Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Dale Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Carlton Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?