Border v. Sykes Enterprises, Inc.
Plaintiff: Brittany Border
Defendant: Sykes Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv00171
Filed: January 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2022 NOTICE : The Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for March 15, 2022 is VACATED. (sln)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Show Cause Response due by 4/8/2022. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 3/9/2022. (jk)
March 7, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Brittany Border (Moyle, Jeffrey)
March 1, 2022 Filing 8 STIPULATION Second Joint to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Defendant Sykes Enterprises, Inc.. (Sanders, Lauren)
February 15, 2022 NOTATION - Set/Reset deadlines re #6 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Sykes Enterprises, Inc. answer due 3/3/2022. (jlk)
February 11, 2022 Filing 6 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, New date requested 3/3/2022. by Defendant Sykes Enterprises, Inc.. (Sanders, Lauren) Modified text on 2/15/2022 (jlk).
February 11, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE by Plaintiff Brittany Border of Filing Consent to Join Form Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Form) (Moyle, Jeffrey)
January 31, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed: Sykes Enterprises, Inc. served on 1/27/2022, answer due 2/17/2022. (er)
January 24, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk: A copy of the complaint and issued summons was sent to the named defendant via certified mail. (er)
January 21, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Sykes Enterprises, Inc. (er)
January 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Sykes Enterprises, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8680090), filed by Brittany Border. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Form) (Moyle, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Border v. Sykes Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Border
Represented By: Jeffrey Joseph Moyle
Represented By: Hans A Nilges
Represented By: Shannon Marie Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sykes Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?