Campbell et al v. Premierfirst Home Health Care Inc.
Plaintiff: Sahara Campbell and Catherine Morris
Defendant: Premierfirst Home Health Care Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv00199
Filed: January 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 4/6/2022 10:45 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
March 8, 2022 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Premierfirst Home Health Care Inc., Premierfirst Home Health Care Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Premierfirst Home Health Care Inc. for Premierfirst Home Health Care Inc... (Dahmann, Kristina)
March 8, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristina S. Dahmann for Defendant Premierfirst Home Health Care Inc. (Dahmann, Kristina)
March 8, 2022 Filing 8 STIPULATION Extension of Time to Move or Plead by Defendant Premierfirst Home Health Care Inc.. (Dahmann, Kristina)
March 7, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Premierfirst Home Health Care Inc. on 1/20/2022, answer due 3/21/2022. (Dyer, Carrie)
February 28, 2022 Filing 6 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Sahara Campbell, Catherine Morris. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A - Consent to Join Lawsuit) (Dyer, Carrie)
February 28, 2022 Filing 5 Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance Local Rule 5.1 (c): The Clerk's Office has reviewed your filing, docket #2 Notice (Other) filed by Sahara Campbell, Catherine Morris, and it appears that one or more of the PDFs are not text searchable and therefore is not in compliance with Local Rule 5.1 (c). You shall refile docket #2 Notice (Other) filed by Sahara Campbell, Catherine Morris. as a text searchable document(s), linking the document back to the original entry within 24-hours. Non-Compliance Deadline due by 3/1/2022. Please use the event - AMENDED DOCUMENT - NON-MOTION. (jlk)
February 28, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Premierfirst Home Health Care Inc. (jlk)
February 25, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. Summons For Defendant Premierfirst Home Health Care Inc. (Hill, Rebecca)
February 17, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Sahara Campbell, Catherine Morris of Filing Consent Forms (First) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A - Consent to Join Lawsuit) (Dyer, Carrie)
January 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Premierfirst Home Health Care Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8681970), filed by Sahara Campbell, Catherine Morris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A - Consents to Join Lawsuit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Exh. B - Civil Cover Sheet) (Dyer, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell et al v. Premierfirst Home Health Care Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sahara Campbell
Represented By: Gregory R Mansell
Represented By: Rebecca Lyn Hill
Represented By: Carrie J. Dyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Morris
Represented By: Gregory R Mansell
Represented By: Rebecca Lyn Hill
Represented By: Carrie J. Dyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premierfirst Home Health Care Inc.
Represented By: Kristina S. Dahmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?