Kelley v. Cambridge Metropolitan Housing Authority
Plaintiff: Carla Kelley
Defendant: Cambridge Metropolitan Housing Authority
Case Number: 2:2022cv00239
Filed: January 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1938 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Cambridge Metropolitan Housing Authority answer due 4/11/2022. (vb)
March 14, 2022 Filing 5 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION TO ANSWER, MOVE OR PLEAD by Defendant Cambridge Metropolitan Housing Authority. (Newcomb, Angelique)
February 24, 2022 Filing 4 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Carla Kelley. . (Olsheski, Jessica)
February 23, 2022 Filing 3 Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance Local Rule 5.1 (c): The Clerk's Office has reviewed your filing, docket #2 Waiver of Service Executed filed by Carla Kelley and it appears that one or more of the PDFs are not text searchable and therefore is not in compliance with Local Rule 5.1 (c). You shall refile docket #2 Waiver of Service of Summons filed by Carla Kelley as a text searchable document(s), linking the document back to the original entry within 24-hours. Non-Compliance Deadline due by 2/24/2022. (vb)
February 11, 2022 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Cambridge Metropolitan Housing Authority on 1/21/2022, answer due 3/22/2022. (Olsheski, Jessica)
January 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Cambridge Metropolitan Housing Authority ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8683592), filed by Carla Kelley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Olsheski, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelley v. Cambridge Metropolitan Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Kelley
Represented By: Jessica Olsheski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cambridge Metropolitan Housing Authority
Represented By: Angelique Paul Newcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?