Tracy v. Quantum Health, Inc.
Plaintiff: Aimee Tracy
Defendant: Quantum Health, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv00294
Filed: January 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE by Plaintiff Aimee Tracy of Filing Consent Form (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Form) (Gedling, Adam)
February 11, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE by Plaintiff Aimee Tracy of Filing Consent Form (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Form) (Gedling, Adam)
February 9, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. (Coffman, Matthew)
February 9, 2022 Filing 7 Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance Local Rule 5.1 (c): The Clerk's Office has reviewed your filing, docket #6 Waiver of Service Executed filed by Aimee Tracy, and it appears that one or more of the PDFs are not text searchable and therefore is not in compliance with Local Rule 5.1 (c). You shall refile docket #6 Waiver of Service Executed filed by Aimee Tracy as a text searchable document(s), linking the document back to the original entry within 24-hours. Non-Compliance Deadline due by 2/10/2022. (er)
February 7, 2022 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Quantum Health, Inc. on 1/25/2022, answer due 3/28/2022. (Coffman, Matthew)
February 4, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE by Plaintiff Aimee Tracy of Filing Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms) (Gedling, Adam)
February 3, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE by Plaintiff Aimee Tracy of Filing Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms) (Gedling, Adam)
February 2, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE by Plaintiff Aimee Tracy of Filing Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms) (Gedling, Adam)
January 31, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE by Plaintiff Aimee Tracy of Filing Consent Form (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Form) (Gedling, Adam)
January 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Quantum Health, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8690116), filed by Aimee Tracy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Coffman, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tracy v. Quantum Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aimee Tracy
Represented By: Matthew J.P. Coffman
Represented By: Adam C. Gedling
Represented By: Kelsie N Hendren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quantum Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?