Dayton v. NuVasive Clinical Services Monitoring, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Delaine Dayton
Defendant: NuVasive Clinical Services Monitoring, Inc., American Neuromonitoring Associates, P.C., John Does 1-5 and John Does 6-10
Case Number: 2:2022cv00800
Filed: February 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Initial Disclosures due by 4/18/2022; Joinder of Parties & Motions to Amend due by 4/11/2022; Discovery due by 11/30/2022; Protective Order or Clawback Agreement due by 4/29/2022; Dispositive motions due by 3/21/2023; Primary Expert due by 12/31/2022; Rebuttal Expert due by 2/18/2023; Settlement Demand due by 12/31/2022; Response to Settlement Demand due by 1/31/2023; Case is referred to Mediation in 3/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 3/17/2022. (kk2)
March 17, 2022 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/17/2022. (jr)
March 9, 2022 Filing 5 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendants American Neuromonitoring Associates, P.C., NuVasive Clinical Services Monitoring, Inc.. (Brudny, James)
February 23, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by American Neuromonitoring Associates, P.C., NuVasive Clinical Services Monitoring, Inc.. (daf)
February 23, 2022 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against American Neuromonitoring Associates, P.C., NuVasive Clinical Services Monitoring, Inc., filed by Delaine Dayton. (daf)
February 23, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 3/17/2022 11:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
February 18, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Common Pleas, case number 22CV000307, filed by NuVasive Clinical Services Monitoring, Inc., American Neuromonitoring Associates, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Answer, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Brudny, James)
February 18, 2022 Filing fee (Removal): $ 402.00, receipt number AOHSDC-8732097 (kk2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dayton v. NuVasive Clinical Services Monitoring, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delaine Dayton
Represented By: Patricia Horner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NuVasive Clinical Services Monitoring, Inc.
Represented By: James Joseph Brudny, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Neuromonitoring Associates, P.C.
Represented By: James Joseph Brudny, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 6-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?