Darling v. Katz Tires Service LLC
Plaintiff: Mark Darling
Defendant: Katz Tires Service LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv01910
Filed: April 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James L Graham
Referring Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 7/19/2022 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
May 31, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Strike by Defendant Katz Tires Service LLC. (Olsheski, Jessica)
May 19, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE by Plaintiff Mark Darling of Withdrawal of Consent to Join Form (Baishnab, Robi)
May 18, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Katz Tires Service LLC. (Olsheski, Jessica)
May 10, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE by Plaintiff Mark Darling Of Filing Consent Form To Join In Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent Form) (Baishnab, Robi)
May 9, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE by Plaintiff Mark Darling Of Filing Consent Form To Join In Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent Form) (Baishnab, Robi)
May 3, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Katz Tires Service LLC. Katz Tires Service LLC served on 5/2/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (Baishnab, Robi)
April 15, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk: A copy of the complaint and issued summons was sent to the named defendant via certified mail. (er)
April 11, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Katz Tires Service LLC. (ds)
April 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Katz Tires Service LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8813928), filed by Mark Darling. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form, #3 Exhibit A-Consent Form) (Baishnab, Robi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Darling v. Katz Tires Service LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Darling
Represented By: Robi J Baishnab
Represented By: Jeffrey Joseph Moyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katz Tires Service LLC
Represented By: Jessica Olsheski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?