Miller v. Collins et al
Plaintiff: Lawrence Miller
Defendant: Warden Emma Collins, Unknown Medical and Nursing Personnel, Director Annette Chambers-Smith, Unknown John/Jane Doe and Annette Chambers-Smith
Case Number: 2:2022cv01944
Filed: April 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTATION ORDER granting #15 Motion to Continue. Pretrial Conference reset for 7/6/2022 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 5/18/22. (jr)
May 13, 2022 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Continue Pre-Trial by Defendants Annette Chambers-Smith, Emma Collins, Unknown John/Jane Doe, Unknown Medical and Nursing Personnel & Plaintiff Lawrence Miller. (Messina, Salvatore) Modified filing parties on 5/13/2022 (kk2)
May 11, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Salvatore Peter Messina for Defendants Annette Chambers-Smith, Emma Collins, Unknown John/Jane Doe, Unknown Medical and Nursing Personnel (Messina, Salvatore)
May 4, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 5/25/2022 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
May 3, 2022 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Emma Collins on 4/28/2022, answer due 6/27/2022. (Patituce, Joseph)
May 3, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Annette Chambers-Smith on 4/28/2022, answer due 6/27/2022. (Patituce, Joseph)
April 29, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John H Bates for Defendants Annette Chambers-Smith, Emma Collins, Unknown John/Jane Doe, Unknown Medical and Nursing Personnel (Bates, John)
April 28, 2022 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Lawrence Miller. (Thomas, Mallorie)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Plaintiff is within the timeframe prescribed by Rule 15(a)(1)(A) since Defendant has not yet been served. Thus, Plaintiff does not need leave of Court to file an amendment. Thus, hisMotion to Amend the Complaint (Doc. #7 ) is permitted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/28/22. (jr)
April 27, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Lawrence Miller. (Thomas, Mallorie)
April 14, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE: Corrected Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Lawrence Miller (Thomas, Mallorie) (Main Document 6 flattened and replaced on 4/18/2022) (kk2)
April 14, 2022 Filing 5 Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance Local Rule 5.1 (c): The Clerk's Office has reviewed your filing, docket #4 Notice of Civil Cover Sheet filed by Lawrence Miller, and it appears that one or more of the PDFs are not text searchable and therefore is not in compliance with Local Rule 5.1 (c). You shall refile docket #4 Notice of Civil Cover Sheet as a text searchable document(s), linking the document back to the original entry within 24-hours. Non-Compliance Deadline due by 4/15/2022. (kk2)
April 13, 2022 Filing 4 **Filing is non-compliant with LR 5.1(c). See ECF No. #6 for corrected document** - NOTICE by Plaintiff Lawrence Miller Civil Cover Sheet (Patituce, Joseph) Modified text on 4/18/2022 (kk2)
April 12, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mallorie Anne Thomas for Plaintiff Lawrence Miller (Thomas, Mallorie)
April 12, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph C Patituce for Plaintiff Lawrence Miller (Patituce, Joseph)
April 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8818165), filed by Lawrence Miller. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Patituce, Joseph) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/13/2022- fillable documents must be flattened before filing) (er).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Collins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Miller
Represented By: Mallorie Anne Thomas
Represented By: Joseph C Patituce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Emma Collins
Represented By: Salvatore Peter Messina
Represented By: John H Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Medical and Nursing Personnel
Represented By: Salvatore Peter Messina
Represented By: John H Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Annette Chambers-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown John/Jane Doe
Represented By: Salvatore Peter Messina
Represented By: John H Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annette Chambers-Smith
Represented By: Salvatore Peter Messina
Represented By: John H Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?