Allen et al v. Shamrock Towing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Amy Allen and Brooke Allen
Defendant: Shamrock Towing, Inc., Timothy L. Duffey and Michael Nelson
Case Number: 2:2022cv01948
Filed: April 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Defendants Timothy L. Duffey, Michael Nelson, Shamrock Towing, Inc. re #14 MOTION for Disclosure (Probst, Erica)
June 10, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Disclosure by Defendants Timothy L. Duffey, Michael Nelson, Shamrock Towing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (Probst, Erica)
June 9, 2022 Filing 15 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Michael Nelson. Returned REFUSED. (jlk)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: The 6/7/2022 Preliminary Pretrial Conference is VACATED. Initial Disclosures due by 6/10/2022; Joinder of Parties & Motions to Amend due by 6/3/2022; Class Certification Motion due by 7/29/2022; Discovery due by 1/27/2023; Dispositive motions due by 2/27/2023; Primary Expert due by 10/28/2022; Rebuttal Expert due by 12/16/2022; Case is referred to Mediation in 1/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/2/2022. (kk2)
June 1, 2022 Filing 12 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiffs Amy Allen, Brooke Allen. (Wido, Christopher)
May 26, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by All Defendants. (Probst, Erica)
May 16, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Timothy L. Duffey on 5/11/2022, answer due 7/11/2022; Michael Nelson on 5/11/2022, answer due 7/11/2022. (Wido, Christopher)
May 11, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 6/7/2022 01:45 PM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
May 9, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Shamrock Towing, Inc. Shamrock Towing, Inc. served on 5/5/2022, answer due 5/26/2022. (jlk)
May 9, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Andrea L. Salvino for Defendants Timothy L. Duffey, Michael Nelson (Probst, Erica) Modified text on 5/10/2022 (jlk).
May 9, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Erica Ann Probst for Defendants Timothy L. Duffey, Michael Nelson (Probst, Erica)
May 6, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Andrea Salvino for Defendant Shamrock Towing, Inc. (Probst, Erica) Modified text on 5/10/2022 (jlk).
May 6, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Erica Ann Probst for Defendant Shamrock Towing, Inc. (Probst, Erica)
May 4, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by the Clerk: The Clerk of the United States District Court, Southern District of Ohio, mailed a copy of the Summons and Complaint via certified mail on May 4, 2022 to the following Defendant(s): TIMOTHY L. DUFFEY, 7021 2720 0002 9245 7684; MICHAEL NELSON, 7021 2720 0002 9245 7707; SHAMROCK TOWING, INC., C/O TIMOTHY DUFFEY, STATUTORY AGENT, 7021 2720 0002 9245 7691. (jlk)
April 13, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Timothy L. Duffey, Michael Nelson, Shamrock Towing, Inc. (jlk)
April 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8818861), filed by Amy Allen, Brooke Allen. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wido, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen et al v. Shamrock Towing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Allen
Represented By: Christopher Wido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke Allen
Represented By: Christopher Wido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shamrock Towing, Inc.
Represented By: Erica Ann Probst
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Salvino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy L. Duffey
Represented By: Erica Ann Probst
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Salvino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Nelson
Represented By: Erica Ann Probst
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Salvino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?