Moore v. Nationwide Children's Hospital
Plaintiff: Tina Moore
Defendant: Nationwide Children's Hospital
Case Number: 2:2022cv01961
Filed: April 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2022 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #15 MOTION to Withdraw #8 Complaint filed by Defendant Nationwide Children's Hospital. (Cohen, Charles)
May 20, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Withdraw #8 Complaint by Plaintiff Tina Moore. (tla)
May 20, 2022 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiff Tina Moore. (tla)
May 20, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald H Chapin for Plaintiff Tina Moore. (tla)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - Plaintiff is ADVISED that the current deadline to respond to the Motion to Dismiss is MAY 23, 2022 unless and until she moves for an extension of time. If current counsel for Plaintiff is unwilling or unable to respond to the Motion to Dismiss or file a motion for an extension of time to do so, Plaintiff is DIRECTED to either retain new counsel or proceed pro se. Plaintiff is CAUTIONED that failure to respond to the Motion to Dismiss could result in it being granted. Discovery in this case is STAYED pending resolution of Defendants Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 5/19/2022. (Copy mailed via US mail to Donald Chapin.) (sln)
May 19, 2022 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers: Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 5/19/2022. Counsel for Plaintiff did not appear. (sln)
May 18, 2022 Filing 10 RULE 26(f) REPORT On Behalf of Nationwide Children's Hospital by Defendant Nationwide Children's Hospital. (Cohen, Charles)
May 3, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Nationwide Children's Hospital. (Cohen, Charles)
April 21, 2022 Filing 8 COMPLAINT filed originally in Franklin County Court of Common Pleas on 4/12/2022 by Tina Moore against Nationwide Children's Hospital. (er)
April 18, 2022 Filing 7 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Defendant Nationwide Children's Hospital. Notice of Removal Attaching Exhibits A, B and C. (Cohen, Charles)
April 18, 2022 Filing 6 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Defendant Nationwide Children's Hospital. Corporate Disclosure Statement. (Cohen, Charles)
April 18, 2022 Filing 5 Notice of Deficiency re: Requires a filing fee or motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Electronic filers can pay the fee #online. Please scroll down to the event called, Pay Fees Via Pay.gov to pay the required fee. Related Document: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Nationwide Children's Hospital. Deficiency Deadline by 5/18/2022. (tla)
April 18, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Hearing:Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/19/2022 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
April 18, 2022 Filing Fee Received: $402.00, receipt number AOHSDC-8823516. (tla)
April 15, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE by Defendant Nationwide Children's Hospital re #1 Notice of Removal attaching Exhibits A, B and C (Clark, Daniel)
April 15, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Nationwide Children's Hospital. (Clark, Daniel)
April 15, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Common Pleas Court, case number 22CV002322, filed by Nationwide Children's Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Clark, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Nationwide Children's Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Moore
Represented By: Donald H Chapin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Children's Hospital
Represented By: Daniel J Clark
Represented By: Charles E. Cohen
Represented By: Daniel E Shuey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?