Wilhoit v. Ohio Living et al
Plaintiff: Kayla Wilhoit and Bridgett Boyd
Defendant: Ohio Living and Ohio Living Communities
Case Number: 2:2022cv01962
Filed: April 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Sarah D Morrison
2 Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE by Plaintiff Bridgett Boyd of Filing Consent Form (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Form) (Gedling, Adam)
June 10, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE by Plaintiff Bridgett Boyd of Withdrawal of Consent to Join Form (Coffman, Matthew)
June 10, 2022 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Bridgett Boyd. (Coffman, Matthew)
June 10, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Consent to Join by Plaintiff Kayla Wilhoit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join) (Hendren, Kelsie) Modified text on 6/13/2022 (kk2)
June 2, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Filing Consent Form by Plaintiff Kayla Wilhoit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Form) (Gedling, Adam) Modified text on 6/2/2022 (kk2)
May 27, 2022 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Ohio Living, Ohio Living Communities. Ohio Living served on 5/27/2022, answer due 6/17/2022; Ohio Living Communities served on 5/27/2022, answer due 6/17/2022. (Gedling, Adam)
May 27, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Filing Consent Form by Plaintiff Kayla Wilhoit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Form) (Gedling, Adam) Modified text on 5/31/2022 (kk2)
May 25, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing Consent Form by Plaintiff Kayla Wilhoit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Form) (Gedling, Adam) Modified text on 5/26/2022 (kk2)
May 23, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Consent Forms by Plaintiff Kayla Wilhoit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms) (Gedling, Adam) Modified text on 5/23/2022 (kk2)
May 11, 2022 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Ohio Living & Ohio Living Communities (kk2)
May 10, 2022 Filing 16 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Gedling, Adam)
May 4, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing Consent Form by Plaintiff Kayla Wilhoit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Form) (Gedling, Adam) Modified text on 5/5/2022 (kk2)
May 3, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing Consent Form by Plaintiff Kayla Wilhoit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Form) (Gedling, Adam) Modified text on 5/3/2022 (kk2)
April 29, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing Consent Form by Plaintiff Kayla Wilhoit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Form) (Gedling, Adam) Modified text on 5/2/2022 (kk2)
April 28, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE by Plaintiff Kayla Wilhoit of Filing Consent Form (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Form) (Gedling, Adam)
April 25, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE by Plaintiff Kayla Wilhoit of Filing Consent Form (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Form) (Gedling, Adam)
April 22, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE by Plaintiff Kayla Wilhoit of Filing Consent Form (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Form) (Gedling, Adam)
April 20, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Consent Form by Plaintiff Kayla Wilhoit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Form) (Gedling, Adam) Modified text on 4/21/2022 (kk2)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:21-cv-3791 ARE related. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 04/19/2022. (tla)
April 19, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Consent Forms by Plaintiff Kayla Wilhoit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms) (Gedling, Adam) Modified on 4/20/2022 to clarify tet (kk2)
April 18, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Consent Form by Plaintiff Kayla Wilhoit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Form) (Gedling, Adam) Modified text on 4/18/2022 (kk2)
April 15, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE re #4 Notice of Filing Consent Form by Plaintiff Kayla Wilhoit (Gedling, Adam) Modified on 4/18/2022 to clarify text (kk2)
April 15, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Consent Form by Plaintiff Kayla Wilhoit (Gedling, Adam) Modified text on 4/18/2022 (kk2)
April 14, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE by Plaintiff Kayla Wilhoit of Filing Consent Forms to Join Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consents to Join) (Coffman, Matthew)
April 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8823567), filed by Kayla Wilhoit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Coffman, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilhoit v. Ohio Living et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Wilhoit
Represented By: Matthew J.P. Coffman
Represented By: Adam C. Gedling
Represented By: Kelsie N Hendren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridgett Boyd
Represented By: Matthew J.P. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Living
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Living Communities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?