Chase v. ViaQuest Residential Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Brandy Chase
Defendant: ViaQuest Residential Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv01974
Filed: April 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE by Plaintiff Brandy Chase Of Filing Consent Form To Join In Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent Form) (Draher, Shannon)
June 2, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE by Plaintiff Brandy Chase Of Filing Consent Form To Join In Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent Form) (Draher, Shannon)
May 23, 2022 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant ViaQuest Residential Services, LLC. (Griffin, Louise)
May 23, 2022 Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, of Plaintiff filed by ViaQuest Residential Services, LLC. (Griffin, Louise)
May 23, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael B Mattingly for Defendant ViaQuest Residential Services, LLC (Mattingly, Michael)
May 23, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Louise Marie Griffin for Defendant ViaQuest Residential Services, LLC (Griffin, Louise)
May 23, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Hilliard for Defendant ViaQuest Residential Services, LLC (Hilliard, Jason)
May 4, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant ViaQuest Residential Services, LLC. ViaQuest Residential Services, LLC served on 5/2/2022, Answer due 5/23/2022. (vb)
April 28, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by the Clerk: A copy of the complaint and issued summons was sent to the named defendant via certified mail. (tla)
April 19, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ViaQuest Residential Services, LLC. (vb)
April 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against ViaQuest Residential Services, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8826012), filed by Brandy Chase. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form, #3 Exhibit A-Consent Form) (Draher, Shannon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chase v. ViaQuest Residential Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy Chase
Represented By: Shannon Marie Draher
Represented By: Jeffrey Joseph Moyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViaQuest Residential Services, LLC
Represented By: Louise Marie Griffin
Represented By: Jason Hilliard
Represented By: Michael B Mattingly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?