Buco v. Kerry Inc.
Plaintiff: Renee Buco
Defendant: Kerry Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv02005
Filed: April 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Stay. Parties are ORDERED to file a Joint Written Status Report detailing the status of this case on or before 8/1/2022 unless they have file an appropriate dismissal entry prior to that date. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 6/10/2022. (cw)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTATION ORDER - In light of the Joint Motion to Stay Case, (Doc. #9 ), the Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled on June 7, 2022 is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/1/22. (jr)
May 31, 2022 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Stay Case by Defendant Kerry Inc.. (Folk, Allison)
May 24, 2022 Filing 8 STIPULATION For Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead by Defendant Kerry Inc.. (Folk, Allison)
May 11, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 6/7/2022 01:30 PM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
May 10, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison Gluvna Folk for Defendant Kerry Inc. (Folk, Allison)
May 6, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Kerry Inc. Kerry Inc. served on 5/4/2022, answer due 5/25/2022. (jlk)
May 4, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE by Plaintiff Renee Buco of Filing Consent to Join Forms Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Forms) (Moyle, Jeffrey)
April 28, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by the Clerk: The Clerk of the United States District Court, Southern District of Ohio, mailed a copy of the Summons and Complaint via certified mail to the following Defendant: Kerry Inc., c/o CT Corporation System, 4400 Easton Commons Way, Suite 125, Columbus, Ohio 43219, 7021 2720 0001 9499 8667. (jlk)
April 21, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kerry Inc. (jlk)
April 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Kerry Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8830849), filed by Renee Buco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Form) (Moyle, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buco v. Kerry Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Buco
Represented By: Jeffrey Joseph Moyle
Represented By: Hans A Nilges
Represented By: Shannon Marie Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerry Inc.
Represented By: Allison Gluvna Folk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?