Thorpe v. DHL Express (USA), Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mark Thorpe et al. and Mark Thorpe
Defendant: DHL Express (USA), Inc. et al, DHL Express (USA), Inc. doing business as DHL Express and Exel Inc. doing business as DHL Supply Chain (USA)
Case Number: 2:2022cv02035
Filed: April 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting re #17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, New date requested 7/1/2022. Exel Inc. answer due 7/1/2022.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 6/10/2022. (daf)
June 9, 2022 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, New date requested 7/1/2022. by Defendant Exel Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (White, Anthony)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Dismiss. All claims by Thorpe against DHL Express only are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with each party to bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 05/19/2022. (tla)
May 19, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Exel Inc. answer due 6/10/2022. (tla)
May 18, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE by Plaintiff Mark Thorpe of Filing Consent (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent, #2 Exhibit 2 - Consent, #3 Exhibit 3 - Consent, #4 Exhibit 4 - Consent, #5 Exhibit 5 - Consent) (Parmet, Matthew)
May 18, 2022 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant DHL Express (USA), Inc. Only, Without Prejudice by Plaintiff Mark Thorpe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Parmet, Matthew)
May 18, 2022 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Excel, Inc.'s Time to Answer by Plaintiff Mark Thorpe. (Parmet, Matthew)
May 11, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Exel Inc.. Exel Inc. served on 4/29/2022, answer due 5/20/2022. (Asay, Joseph)
May 11, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant DHL Express (USA), Inc.. (Asay, Joseph)
May 9, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Scott Parmet for Plaintiff Mark Thorpe (Parmet, Matthew)
May 9, 2022 Filing 9 Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance Local Rule 5.1 (c): The Clerk's Office has reviewed your filing, docket #7 Summons Returned Executed filed by Mark Thorpe, and it appears that one or more of the PDFs are not text searchable and therefore is not in compliance with Local Rule 5.1 (c). You shall refile docket #7 Summons Returned Executed as a text searchable document(s), linking the document back to the original entry within 24-hours. Non-Compliance Deadline due by 5/10/2022. (tla)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael S. Parmet as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 05/09/2022. (tla)
May 6, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8854403) of Matthew S. Parmet by Plaintiff Mark Thorpe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Asay, Joseph)
May 6, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant DHL Express (USA), Inc.. DHL Express (USA), Inc. served on 5/3/2022, answer due 5/24/2022. (Asay, Joseph)
May 4, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE by Plaintiff Mark Thorpe Opt-In Consent Form (Asay, Joseph)
May 3, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE by Plaintiff Mark Thorpe Consent to Join (Asay, Joseph)
April 26, 2022 Filing 4 Notice by Clerk of Pro Hac Vice rules as to Attorney Matthew S Parmet. (vb)
April 26, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Exel Inc. (vb)
April 26, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to DHL Express (USA), Inc. et al. (vb) Modified on 4/26/2022 (vb).
April 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against DHL Express (USA), Inc. et al ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8835070), filed by Mark Thorpe et al.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form DHL Express, #3 Summons Form Exel) (Asay, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thorpe v. DHL Express (USA), Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Thorpe et al.
Represented By: Joseph Corey Asay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Thorpe
Represented By: Joseph Corey Asay
Represented By: Matthew Scott Parmet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DHL Express (USA), Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DHL Express (USA), Inc. doing business as DHL Express
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exel Inc. doing business as DHL Supply Chain (USA)
Represented By: Anthony C White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?