Morrow v. Ohio Pizza 17, LLC
Plaintiff: Brandon Morrow
Defendant: Ohio Pizza 17, LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv02048
Filed: April 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing:Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/14/2022 10:30 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
June 7, 2022 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Ohio Pizza 17, LLC, Ohio Pizza 17, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Ohio Pizza 17, LLC for Ohio Pizza 17, LLC.. (Courtwright, Angela)
June 7, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Ohio Pizza 17, LLC. (Courtwright, Angela)
May 17, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Ohio Pizza 17, LLC. Ohio Pizza 17, LLC served on 5/17/2022, answer due 6/7/2022. (Sanford, Joshua)
April 28, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ohio Pizza 17, LLC. (jlk)
April 28, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE as to Non-Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Brandon Morrow re #1 Complaint. (vb)
April 27, 2022 Filing 2 Notice by Clerk of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorneys Sean Short & Josh Sanford. (vb)
April 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ohio Pizza 17, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8839760), filed by Brandon Morrow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Morrow Notice of Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Form) (DeRose, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morrow v. Ohio Pizza 17, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Morrow
Represented By: Robert E DeRose, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Pizza 17, LLC
Represented By: Angela Courtwright
Represented By: Paul L Bittner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?