Hicks v. Crowley et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Hicks
Defendant: Executive Director kathleen crowley, Chair David Harberger, Vice Chair Jasmine Clements, Jeffrey Caswell, Board of Tax Appeals, Kathleen Crowley, David Harberger, Jasmine Clements and Ohio Board of Tax Appeals
Case Number: 2:2022cv02204
Filed: May 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Jeffrey Caswell, Jasmine Clements, Kathleen Crowley, David Harberger, and Ohio Board of Tax Appeals answers due 8/3/2022 per #21 (Stipulation) (kk2)
July 13, 2022 Filing 21 STIPULATION for Extension to Move or Plead by Defendants Jeffrey Caswell, Jasmine Clements, Kathleen Crowley, David Harberger, Ohio Board of Tax Appeals & Plaintiff Christopher Hicks. (Honen, Brian) Modified parties on 7/14/2022 (kk2)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting re #19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Replies due by 7/19/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 7/6/2022. (daf) Modified on 7/7/2022 to clarify text (kk2)
July 5, 2022 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Christopher Hicks. New date requested 7/19/2022. (Kinsley, Jennifer) Modified on 7/7/2022 to correct text and document linking (kk2)
June 23, 2022 Filing 18 AMENDED DOCUMENT re #13 Waiver of Service Executed by Plaintiff Christopher Hicks. . (Owens, Nicholas) Modified on 6/24/2022 to add document link (kk2)
June 23, 2022 Filing 17 AMENDED DOCUMENT re #12 Waiver of Service Executed by Plaintiff Christopher Hicks. . (Owens, Nicholas) Modified on 6/24/2022 to add document link (kk2)
June 23, 2022 Filing 16 AMENDED DOCUMENT re #10 Waiver of Service Executed by Plaintiff Christopher Hicks. . (Owens, Nicholas) Modified on 6/24/2022 to add document text (kk2)
June 23, 2022 Filing 15 AMENDED DOCUMENT re #9 Waiver of Service Executed by Plaintiff Christopher Hicks. . (Owens, Nicholas) Modified on 6/24/2022 to add document link (kk2)
June 23, 2022 Filing 14 Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance Local Rule 5.1 (c): The Clerk's Office has reviewed your filings, docket #9 #10 #12 #13 Waivers of Service Executed filed by Christopher Hicks, and it appears that one or more of the PDFs are not text searchable and therefore is not in compliance with Local Rule 5.1 (c). You shall refile all of dockets #9 #10 #12 #13 as a text searchable document(s), using the "Amended Document" filing event, linking the document back to the original entry within 24-hours. Non-Compliance Deadline due by 6/24/2022. (kk2)
June 22, 2022 WAIVERS OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Waivers sent to Jeffrey Caswell; Jasmine Clements; Kathleen Crowley; David Harberger; and Ohio Board of Tax Appeals on 5/23/2022, answers due 7/22/2022This entry is being created to enter the correct service and answer due dates for the parties who have waived service. See docket numbers #9 #10 #11 #12 and #13 . (kk2)
June 22, 2022 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Kathleen Crowley on 5/21/2022, answer due 7/20/2022. (Owens, Nicholas)
June 22, 2022 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Jeffrey Caswell on 5/21/2022, answer due 7/20/2022. (Owens, Nicholas)
June 22, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Jasmine Clements on 5/21/2022, answer due 7/20/2022. (Owens, Nicholas)
June 22, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to David Harberger on 5/21/2022, answer due 7/20/2022. (Owens, Nicholas)
June 22, 2022 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Ohio Board of Tax Appeals on 5/21/2022, answer due 7/20/2022. (Owens, Nicholas)
June 21, 2022 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants Jeffrey Caswell, Jasmine Clements, Kathleen Crowley, David Harberger, Ohio Board of Tax Appeals. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Mary Therese Bridge Exhibit B, #2 Affidavit of Kathleen Crowley Exhibit B, #3 Affidavit of Kody Teaford Exhibit C) (Damaser, Hilary)
June 8, 2022 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Robert Honen for Defendants Jeffrey Caswell, Jasmine Clements, Kathleen Crowley, David Harberger, Ohio Board of Tax Appeals SEE DOCKET NUMBER #7 FOR DOCUMENT (kk2)
June 8, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Hilary R Damaser for Defendants Jeffrey Caswell, Jasmine Clements, Kathleen Crowley, David Harberger, Ohio Board of Tax Appeals (Damaser, Hilary)
May 31, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Christopher Hicks. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A: Christopher Hicks Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B: C. Hicks Ban, #3 Exhibit C: B. Hicks Ban) (Kinsley, Jennifer) Modified text on 6/1/2022 (kk2)
May 19, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED DOCUMENT re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Christopher Hicks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: November 2, 2021 Public Records Response, #2 Exhibit B: November 8, 2021 Public Records Response, #3 Exhibit C: C. Hicks Ban, #4 Exhibit D: B. Hicks Ban) (Kinsley, Jennifer) Modified on 5/20/2022 to add missing document link as required by the 5/19/2022 notice (kk2)
May 19, 2022 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance Local Rule 5.1 (c): The Clerk's Office has reviewed your filing, docket #1 Complaint filed by Christopher Hicks, and it appears that one or more of the PDFs are not text searchable and therefore is not in compliance with Local Rule 5.1 (c). You shall refile all of docket #1 Complaint as a text searchable document(s), using the "Amended Document" filing event, linking the document back to the original entry within 24-hours. Non-Compliance Deadline due by 5/20/2022. (kk2)
May 19, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE by Plaintiff Christopher Hicks Civil cover sheet (Kinsley, Jennifer)
May 18, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Ryan Owens for Defendant Christopher Hicks (Owens, Nicholas)
May 18, 2022 Filing 1 **Filing is non-compliant with LR 5.1(c). See ECF No. #5 for corrected document** - COMPLAINT against Ohio Board of Tax Appeals, Jeffrey Caswell, Jasmine Clements, David Harberger, Kathleen Crowley ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8869326), filed by Christopher Hicks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: November 2, 2021 Public Records Response, #2 Exhibit B: November 8, 2021 Public Records Response, #3 Exhibit C: C. Hicks Ban, #4 Exhibit D: B. Hicks Ban) (Kinsley, Jennifer) Modified on 5/19/2022 to correct text and party names (kk2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hicks v. Crowley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Hicks
Represented By: Nicholas Ryan Owens
Represented By: Jennifer M Kinsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Director kathleen crowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chair David Harberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vice Chair Jasmine Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Caswell
Represented By: Hilary R Damaser
Represented By: Brian Robert Honen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Tax Appeals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Crowley
Represented By: Hilary R Damaser
Represented By: Brian Robert Honen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Harberger
Represented By: Hilary R Damaser
Represented By: Brian Robert Honen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jasmine Clements
Represented By: Hilary R Damaser
Represented By: Brian Robert Honen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Board of Tax Appeals
Represented By: Hilary R Damaser
Represented By: Brian Robert Honen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?