Lott v. Ohio Bar Association
Plaintiff: Harry William Lott
Defendant: Ohio Bar Association
Case Number: 2:2022cv02219
Filed: May 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend-Supplemental Pleading, Motion to Disqualify #7 by Plaintiff Harry William Lott. Attachments: #1 envelope) (vb)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER terminating #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; terminating #10 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; terminating #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court will conduct an initial screening of the Complaint as soon as practicable to identify cognizable claims and to recommend dismissal of Plaintiffs Complaint, or any portion of it, which is frivolous, malicious, fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted, or seeks monetary relief from a defendant who is immune from such relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on June 5, 2022. (jlk)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 15, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Harry William Lott. (jlk)
June 13, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Harry William Lott. (jlk)
June 13, 2022 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Harry William Lott. (jlk)
June 8, 2022 Filing 7 Memorandum In Support by Plaintiff Harry William Lott. (jlk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - If Plaintiff intends to proceed with this action, he is AGAIN ORDERED to cure this deficiency by submitting the requisite $402.00 filing fee or by filing a fully completed, and signed, application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis WITHIN FOURTEEN (14) DAYS. Deficiency Deadline by 6/20/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on June 6, 2022. (jlk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 3, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Harry William Lott. (Documents may be a duplicate filing in Doc #1 . (Attachments: #1 envelope) (vb)
May 27, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE by Plaintiff Harry William Lott re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tla)
May 25, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE by Plaintiff Harry William Lott re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tla)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER issued re #1 Affidavit- In forma pauperis filed by Harry William Lott in that if Plaintiff intends to proceed with this action, he is ORDERED to cure this deficiency by submitting the requisite $402.00 filing fee or by filing a fully completed, and signed, application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS of the date of this Order. For Plaintiff's convenience, the Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Court'sin forma pauperis application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 5/24/22. (sem)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 19, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Harry William Lott. (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 Env.) (jlk) Modified filer on 5/23/2022 (er).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lott v. Ohio Bar Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry William Lott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Bar Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?