Gugliotta v. Davison Design & Development Inc
Plaintiff: John D Gugliotta
Defendant: Davison Design & Development Inc
Case Number: 2:2022cv03125
Filed: August 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE by Plaintiff John D Gugliotta (Civil Cover Sheet) (Welling, David)
September 28, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Davison Design & Development Inc. (daf)
September 27, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Related CM/ECF Doc. # 3-4.) (Welling, David)
August 16, 2022 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Davison Design & Development Inc, filed by John D Gugliotta. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Infringement Specimen, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Consent Order, #4 Summons Form, #5 Exhibit Trademark) (Welling, David)
August 16, 2022 Filing 2 Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance Local Rule 5.1 (c): The Clerk's Office has reviewed your filing, docket #1 Complaint, filed by John D Gugliotta., and it appears that one or more of the PDFs are not text searchable and therefore is not in compliance with Local Rule 5.1 (c). You shall refile docket #1 Complaint, filed by John D Gugliotta. as a text searchable document(s), linking the document back to the original entry within 24-hours. Non-Compliance Deadline due by 8/17/2022. (daf)
August 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Davison Design & Development Inc ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9004868), filed by John D Gugliotta. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Infringement Specimen, #2 Exhibit Trademark Registration, #3 Exhibit Consent Order, #4 Summons Form Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Welling, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gugliotta v. Davison Design & Development Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D Gugliotta
Represented By: David Anthony Welling
Represented By: Charles Vincent Choken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davison Design & Development Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?