Litepanels, Ltd. v. Godox Photo Equipment Co., Ltd.
Plaintiff: Litepanels, Ltd.
Defendant: Godox Photo Equipment Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2022cv03235
Filed: August 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James L Graham
Referring Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
2 Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
3 Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 10/18/2022. (jk)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge James L. Graham recused. Case reassigned to Judge Michael H. Watson for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 10/7/22. (ds)
September 21, 2022 Filing 14 Ex Parte MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Plaintiff Litepanels, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum in Support of Ex Parte Motion to Consolidate, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Jones, Aaron)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: I am the Judge on both/all of the listed cases ( 2:22-cv-3143 & 2:22-cv-3235) and have determined that the cases are related and they shall both/all remain on my docket. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 9/20/2022. (vb)
August 30, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Jones for Plaintiff Litepanels, Ltd. (Jones, Aaron)
August 25, 2022 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 2:22-cv-00088. Original file electronic copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Change Venue and Transfer Action to Southern District of Ohio (Eastern Division). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/25/2022. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/25/2022.]
August 24, 2022 Filing 8 Ex Parte MOTION to Change Venue and Transfer Action to Southern District of Ohio (Eastern Division) by Litepanels, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in support of Ex Parte Motion to Transfer, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Karl Fisher, #3 Exhibit B - Complaint filed in Southern District of Ohio, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Fisher, Karl) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/25/2022.]
June 13, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE by Litepanels, Ltd. Notice to Court Regarding Status of Service (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Karl Fisher in support of Notice)(Fisher, Karl) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/25/2022.]
March 30, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Michael Magee on behalf of Litepanels, Ltd. (Magee, David) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/25/2022.]
March 30, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Karl Thomas Fisher on behalf of Litepanels, Ltd. (Fisher, Karl) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/25/2022.]
March 30, 2022 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Litepanels, Ltd. (Goolsby, Kenneth) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/25/2022.]
March 30, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Goolsby, Kenneth) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/25/2022.]
March 17, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Godox Photo Equipment Co., Ltd.. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/25/2022.]
March 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Godox Photo Equipment Co., Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8832897.), filed by Litepanels, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Goolsby, Kenneth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/16/2022: #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (nkl, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/25/2022.]
March 16, 2022 Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/25/2022.]
March 16, 2022 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/25/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Litepanels, Ltd. v. Godox Photo Equipment Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Litepanels, Ltd.
Represented By: David Michael Magee
Represented By: Karl Thomas Fisher
Represented By: Kenneth Crouch Goolsby
Represented By: Aaron Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Godox Photo Equipment Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?