Humphrey v. Erie Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Naomi Humphrey
Defendant: Erie Insurance Company
Cross Defendant: Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Cigna Health Management, Inc. and John Doe Health Insurance Provider
Case Number: 2:2022cv03879
Filed: November 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE by Defendant Erie Insurance Company of Service of Initial Disclosures (Calderone, Kenneth)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Initial Disclosures due by 12/6/2022; Joinder of Parties & Motions to Amend due by 1/6/2023; Discovery due by 3/1/2023; Protective Order or Clawback Agreement due by 2/1/2023; Dispositive motions due by 6/2/2023; Primary Expert due by 6/30/2023; Rebuttal Expert due by 8/11/2023; Settlement Demand due by 3/1/2023; Response to Settlement Demand due by 4/3/2023; Case is referred to Mediation in 4/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 12/6/2022. (kk2)
December 6, 2022 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/6/2022. (jr)
December 6, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE by Plaintiff Naomi Humphrey (Tsarnas, Nomiki)
December 6, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Cross Defendant Cigna Health Management, Inc.. Cigna Health Management, Inc. served on 11/28/2022, answer due 12/19/2022. (Calderone, Kenneth)
December 2, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Cross Defendant Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company served on 11/28/2022, answer due 12/19/2022. (Calderone, Kenneth)
November 18, 2022 Filing 11 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Naomi Humphrey. (Tsarnas, Nomiki)
November 18, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued as to Cigna Health Management, Inc. and Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Cigna Health Management) (tla)
November 10, 2022 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Erie Insurance Company. (Calderone, Kenneth)
November 9, 2022 Filing 7 Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance Local Rule 5.1 (c): The Clerk's Office has reviewed your filing, docket #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Erie Insurance Company, and it appears the document is not text searchable and therefore is not in compliance with Local Rule 5.1 (c). You shall refile docket #6 as a text searchable document(s), linking the document back to the original entry within 24-hours. Non-Compliance Deadline due by 11/10/2022. (vb)
November 7, 2022 Filing 9 CROSSCLAIM against John Doe Health Insurance Provider, filed by Erie Insurance Company. See docket no. #5 for document. (tla)
November 7, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Erie Insurance Company. (Calderone, Kenneth)
November 7, 2022 Filing 5 CROSSCLAIM against Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Cigna Health Management, Inc., filed by Erie Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, #2 Summons Form Cigna Health Management, Inc.) (Calderone, Kenneth)
November 7, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Erie Insurance Company. (Calderone, Kenneth)
November 3, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 12/6/2022 10:30 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
November 3, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Erie Insurance Company, filed by Naomi Humphrey. (jlk)
November 2, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin, case number 22CV006971 ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9122858), filed by Erie Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons and Complaint) (Calderone, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humphrey v. Erie Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi Humphrey
Represented By: Nomiki P. Tsarnas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erie Insurance Company
Represented By: Kenneth A Calderone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Cigna Health Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: John Doe Health Insurance Provider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?