Harvey v. Franklin County, OH et al
Plaintiff: Nichelle M Harvey
Defendant: Franklin County, OH, State of Ohio, Bradley P. Toman, Adrienne S Foster, Eric T Deighton, Karen H Phipps, Dallas L Baldwin and Maryellen O'Shaughnessy
Case Number: 2:2022cv03886
Filed: November 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea C. Hofer for Defendants Dallas L Baldwin, Franklin County, OH, Maryellen O'Shaughnessy, Karen H Phipps (Hofer, Andrea)
December 7, 2022 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 First MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Eric T Deighton, Adrienne S Foster, Bradley P. Toman. (Deighton, Eric)
December 6, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Show Authority by Plaintiff Nichelle M Harvey (kk2)
December 6, 2022 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 First MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Nichelle M Harvey (kk2)
November 28, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Nichelle M Harvey (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kk2)
November 15, 2022 Filing 3 First MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Eric T Deighton, Adrienne S Foster, Bradley P. Toman. (Deighton, Eric)
November 3, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Eric T Deighton, Adrienne S Foster, Franklin County, OH, Maryellen O'Shaughnessy, Karen H Phipps, State of Ohio, and Bradley P. Toman (kk2)
November 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Dallas L Baldwin, Eric T Deighton, Adrienne S Foster, Franklin County, OH, Maryellen O'Shaughnessy, Karen H Phipps, State of Ohio, and Bradley P. Toman filed by Nichelle M Harvey (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kk2)
November 3, 2022 Filing Fee Received: $402.00, receipt no. 200001040 (tla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harvey v. Franklin County, OH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nichelle M Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin County, OH
Represented By: Andrea C. Hofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley P. Toman
Represented By: Eric T Deighton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrienne S Foster
Represented By: Eric T Deighton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric T Deighton
Represented By: Eric T Deighton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen H Phipps
Represented By: Andrea C. Hofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas L Baldwin
Represented By: Andrea C. Hofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryellen O'Shaughnessy
Represented By: Andrea C. Hofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?