Yorde v. The Sygma Network, Inc. d/b/a Sysco et al
Plaintiff: John Yorde
Defendant: The Sygma Network, Inc. d/b/a Sysco and Lawrence Doubrava
Case Number: 2:2023cv01953
Filed: June 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/15/2023 has been VACATED. Joinder of Parties / Motions to Amend due by 8/21/2023. Initial Disclosures due by 8/31/2023. Discovery due by 12/29/2023. Dispositive motions due by 1/31/2024. Case is referred to Mediation. Case referred to Clerk for assignment of mediator. Mediation Deadline: 11/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/14/2023. (er)
August 8, 2023 Filing 6 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendants Lawrence Doubrava, The Sygma Network, Inc. d/b/a Sysco. (Peters, Patrick)
July 14, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 8/15/2023 11:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
July 7, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Lyndsay Marie Ross for Defendants Lawrence Doubrava, The Sygma Network, Inc. d/b/a Sysco (Ross, Lyndsay)
July 7, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick O Peters for Defendants Lawrence Doubrava, The Sygma Network, Inc. d/b/a Sysco (Peters, Patrick)
June 20, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Lawrence Doubrava, The Sygma Network, Inc. d/b/a Sysco. (ds)
June 16, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9471918), filed by John Yorde. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form Summons x3, #3 Exhibit Right to Sue) (Breedlove, Trisha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yorde v. The Sygma Network, Inc. d/b/a Sysco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Yorde
Represented By: Trisha M. Breedlove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sygma Network, Inc. d/b/a Sysco
Represented By: Lyndsay Marie Flagg
Represented By: Patrick O Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Doubrava
Represented By: Patrick O Peters
Represented By: Lyndsay Marie Flagg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?