Seid v. Commissioner for Social Security
Plaintiff: Indrias Seid
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 2:2023cv03150
Filed: September 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE: As no party has indicated on the previously issued #4 Statement as to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form that they are withholding their consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction, the case will remain with the assigned Magistrate Judge for all matters, including entry of a final judgment pursuant to General Order 22-04. (jmb)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Indrias Seid (kk2)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #1 , #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Certified administrative record due sixty (60) days after filing of the Complaint and SS Identification Form; Plaintiff's statement of errors due forty-five (45) days after filing of the administrative record; Defendant's response in opposition due forty-five (45) days after service of the Statement of Errors; Plaintiff may reply fifteen (15) days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/11/2023. (kk2)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Commissioner of Social Security answer due 12/11/2023 (kk2)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SECOND MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Indrias Seid. (Attachments: #1 Additional Information, #2 Exhibits) (er)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #6 Motion for Discovery. Plaintiff is advised that the Court will order the certified administrative record to be filed by Defendant in accordance with Southern District of Ohio Civil Rule 8.1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/3/2023. (kk2)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Discovery Information by Plaintiff Indrias Seid. (er)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Indrias Seid: The Court is unable to determine how Plaintiff supports himself. Plaintiff is ORDERED to submit a revised Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees on or before 10/12/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/28/2023. (kk2)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Statement As To Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form. The completed Statement As To Magistrate Jurisdiction Form shall be completed and emailed to the Court's Social Security Case Coordinator at, SSA_Coordinator@ohsd.uscourts.gov or mailed to: Office of the ClerkWalter H. Rice Federal Buildingand U.S. CourthouseRoom 712Attn: Social Security Coordinator200 W. Second StreetDayton, Ohio 45402DO NOT ELECTRONICALLY FILE THIS DOCUMENT, IT MUST BE MAILED TO THE ABOVE ADDRESS OR EMAILED TO SSA_Coordinator@ohsd.uscourts.gov. The completed Statement As To Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form due by 10/27/2023 (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) (jmb)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE and GENERAL ORDER 22-04: Pursuant to #S.D. Ohio General Order 22-04, if no party indicates that they are withholding their consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction, the case will remain with the assigned Magistrate Judge for all matters, including entry of a final judgment. Further, the filing of a party's statement of errors or memorandum in opposition without first filing an executed copy of the Statement as to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form will also be deemed as consent by that party to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction over all aspects of the litigation, including entry of a final judgment. (jmb)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Indrias Seid. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (er)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seid v. Commissioner for Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indrias Seid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?