Jarvi v. City of Columbus, Ohio
Plaintiff: Matthew Jarvi
Defendant: City of Columbus, Ohio
Case Number: 2:2024cv02047
Filed: April 30, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2024 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by City of Columbus, Ohio. (Shell-Ayer, Meredith)
May 29, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines: City of Columbus, Ohio answer due 6/29/2024. (er)
May 28, 2024 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. (Shell-Ayer, Meredith)
April 30, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against City of Columbus, Ohio ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9945129), filed by Matthew Jarvi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2024.03.28 EEOC Right to Sue, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2024.02.08 OCRC Right to Sue, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Knoll, Laren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jarvi v. City of Columbus, Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Jarvi
Represented By: Laren E Knoll
Represented By: John Spenceley Marshall
Represented By: Samuel Micah Schlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Columbus, Ohio
Represented By: Meredith W Shell-Ayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?