Titus v. Warden, Southern Ohio Correctional Facility
Petitioner: Timothy Titus
Respondent: Warden, Southern Ohio Correctional Facility
Case Number: 2:2024cv03689
Filed: July 11, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Respondent shall file an answer w/in sixty (60) days; Petitioner may file and serve a Traverse twenty-one (21) days thereafter. Warden, Southern Ohio Correctional Facility answer due 10/28/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/29/2024. (kk2)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification)
August 27, 2024 Filing fee (Habeas): $ 5.00, receipt number 200007114 (kk2)
August 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:24cv2641 are related, the subject case nevertheless will remain with the Judge to who it was assigned. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson and Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 8/7/2024. (mas)
July 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DEFICIENCY ORDER - Petitioner is ORDERED to either pay the $5.00 filing fee or file a motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/29/2024. (er)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
July 12, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Timothy Titus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (mve)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Titus v. Warden, Southern Ohio Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, Southern Ohio Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Timothy Titus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?