Lundy v. Warden, Southern Ohio Correctional Facility
Petitioner: Markale Ian Lundy
Respondent: Warden, Southern Ohio Correctional Facility
Case Number: 2:2024cv03806
Filed: August 1, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
Presiding Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine E. Mullin for Respondent Warden, Southern Ohio Correctional Facility (Mullin, Katherine)
August 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that Respondent shall file an answer conforming to the requirements of Rule 5 of the Rules Governing 2254 Cases within 60 days of the date of filing of this Order. Petitioner may, not later than twenty-one (21) days after the answer is filed, file and serve a reply to the answer. The Clerk is ordered to serve the Petition on Respondent and the Attorney General of Ohio, Habeas Corpus Unit of the Corrections Litigation Section c/o Brian.Higgins@OhioAGO.gov and Habeas.docketclerk@OhioAGO.gov. Response to Order due by 10/15/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 8/14/2024. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 14, 2024 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Petitioner Markale Ian Lundy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (mas)
August 1, 2024 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Ohio Northern; Case Number 5:24-cv-01305. Original file electronic copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order transferring case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 8/1/2024. (M,SM) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2024.]
August 1, 2024 Copy of Order mailed to Markale Ian Lundy 698-331 at Southern Ohio Correction Facility P.O. Box 45699 Lucasville, OH 45699 on 8/1/2024. Related document(s) #3 . (M,SM) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2024.]
August 1, 2024 Judge Michael H. Watson and Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman added. (er)
July 31, 2024 Remark by Clerk: This case was assigned and processed without the filing of a Civil Cover Sheet, which is required by Local Rule 3.13(a). Copy of #2 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order and #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) and blank Civil Cover Sheet was mailed to Markale Ian Lundy, 698-331 at Southern Ohio Correction Facility, P.O. Box 45699, Lucasville, OH 45699 on 7/31/2024. (B,DL) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2024.]
July 30, 2024 Filing 2 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Sara Lioi. Chief District Judge Sara Lioi on 7/30/2024. (B,DL) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2024.]
July 30, 2024 Filing 1 Petition under 28 USC 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a person in state custody. Filing fee paid, $5.00. Receipt number 9636. Filed by Markale Ian Lundy. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Civil Filings, #2 Financial Certificate, #3 Amended Judgment Entry, #4 Ground One - Actual Innocence - Insufficient Evidence, #5 Ground Two - Memorandum - Certified Copies in Support of Ground Two Ineffective Assistance of Appellate Counsel, #6 Ground Three - Memorandum - Certified Copies in Support of Ground Three Improperly Instructing the Jury, #7 Ground Four - Memorandum - Memorandum Certified Copies to Support Ground Four Ineffective Assistance of Counsel, #8 Ground Five - Memorandum - Certified Copies in Support of Ground Five Prosecutorial Misconduct, #9 Envelope) (B,DL) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/31/2024: #10 2254 First page of the petition with receipt number) (B,DL). [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2024.]
July 30, 2024 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (B,DL) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2024.]
July 30, 2024 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (B,DL) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lundy v. Warden, Southern Ohio Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Markale Ian Lundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, Southern Ohio Correctional Facility
Represented By: Katherine E. Mullin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?