Hinkle v. Mingo
Plaintiff: James H. Hinkle
Defendant: Judge Stephanie Mingo
Case Number: 2:2024cv03877
Filed: August 23, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2024 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #5 Complaint filed by James H. Hinkle. The Undersigned RECOMMENDS that the Court DISMISS Plaintiff's claims in the entirety. Objections to R&R due by 10/29/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 10/15/2024. (vb) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 15, 2024 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Judge Stephanie Mingo, filed by James H. Hinkle. (vb)
September 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. All judicial officers who render services in this action shall do so as if the costs had been prepaid. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a). The Court will conduct an initial screening of the Complaint as soon as practicable to identify cognizable claims and to recommend dismissal of Plaintiff's Complaint, or any portion of it, which is frivolous, malicious, fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted, or seeks monetary relief from a defendant who is immune from such relief. 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The Court will then enter an appropriate order and direct service of Summons and Complaint on Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 9/4/2024. (vb) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:24-cv-3877 and 2:21-cv-4447 ARE related. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on September 3, 2024. (jlk)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 23, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff James H. Hinkle (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Form, #4 USM-285 Form) (kk2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hinkle v. Mingo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Stephanie Mingo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James H. Hinkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?