Wasserman v. Weir et al
Plaintiff: Susan Wasserman
Defendant: Robert E. Weir, Carlile Patchen & Murphy LLP, Ryan A. Gordon and Does 1-30
Case Number: 2:2024cv03935
Filed: September 12, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Carlile Patchen & Murphy LLP on 10/30/2024, answer due 12/30/2024. (Wasserman, Susan)
October 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Carlile Patchen & Murphy LLP (kk2)
October 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Wasserman, Susan)
October 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Robert E. Weir on 9/12/2024, answer due 11/12/2024. (Wasserman, Susan)
September 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Ryan A. Gordon on 9/12/2024, answer due 11/12/2024. (Schneider, Karl)
September 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE by Plaintiff Susan Wasserman Supplemental Citizenship Disclosure Statement (Wasserman, Susan)
September 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:24-cv-3334 ARE related. Case reassigned to Chief District Judge Sarah Daggett Morrison and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers for all further proceedings.. Signed by Chief District Judge Sarah Daggett Morrison and Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. on 9/25/24. (sem)
September 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE by Plaintiff Susan Wasserman (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Citizenship Disclosure Statement) (Wasserman, Susan)
September 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER - Plaintiff has also failed to allege any facts establishing the citizenship of the individual or entity defendants. Plaintiff is therefore ORDERED to file a statement within FOURTEEN DAYS alleging sufficient factual allegations for the Court to determine Plaintiff's and each Defendant's citizenship, under the standards for individuals, set forth above, and the standards for entities set forth below. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 9/13/2024. (mve)
September 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: BOHSDC-10164908), filed by Susan Wasserman. [ELECTION ISSUE(S) CITED] (Wasserman, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wasserman v. Weir et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E. Weir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlile Patchen & Murphy LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan A. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Wasserman
Represented By: Susan Anne Wasserman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?