Hill v. Chambers-Smith
Plaintiff: Tyrice Hill
Defendant: Annette Chambers-Smith
Case Number: 2:2025cv00068
Filed: January 24, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James L Graham
Referring Judge: Karen L Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2025 Filing fee: $ 405.00, receipt number 200008642 (kk2)
March 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ( Show Cause Response due by 4/9/2025.); adopting Report and Recommendations re #2 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 3/10/25. (ds)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - IT IS THEREFORE RECOMMENDED THAT: 1. Plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #1 ) be DENIED. 2. Plaintiff be ordered to pay the full $405 ($350 filing fee plus $55 administrative fee)required to commence this action within thirty (30) days, and that plaintiff be notified that his failure to pay the full $405 fee within thirty days will result in the dismissal of his action. 3. The Court certify pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that for the foregoing reasons an appeal of any Order adopting this Report and Recommendation would not be taken in good faith. Objections to R&R due by 2/28/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 02/14/2025. (bjc)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 27, 2025 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Tyrice Hill. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A-C, #3 Exhibit D-G, #4 Exhibit H-J, #5 Exhibit K-L, #6 Exhibit M-P, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 USM form, #9 Summons Form, #10 Envelope) (er)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Chambers-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrice Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annette Chambers-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?