Wright v. Warden Lebanon Corr
Petitioner: Timothy D Wright
Respondent: Warden Lebanon Correctional Institution
Case Number: 3:2002cv00063
Filed: February 8, 2002
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: CLARK
Presiding Judge: Michael R Merz
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Rose
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 63 - It is hereby ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion 62 for Relief from the Courts Order of August 29, 2017 61 ), denying Petitioner's prior Motion to Reopen Judgment 56 is DENIED. This case remains terminated on the docket. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 10-6-2017. (de)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ON MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM THE ORDER OF AUGUST 29, 2017 - Objections to R&R due by 9/28/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 9/14/2017. (kpf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ENTRY AND ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTIONS 60 , ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 58 , DENYING PETITIONER'S MOTION TO REOPEN JUDGMENT 56 . Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 8-29-2017. (de)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ON MOTION TO REOPEN JUDGMENT - Since the statute of limitations has long since run on any claim the state court lacked jurisdiction, Wright's Motion to Reopen should be denied. Because reasonable jurists would not d isagree with this conclusion, the Court should also deny any requested certificate of appealability and certify to the Sixth Circuit that any appeal would be objectively frivolous and should not be permitted to proceed in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 8/15/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 8/1/2017. (kpf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Warden Lebanon Corr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Timothy D Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Lebanon Correctional Institution
Represented By: Stuart Alan Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?