Skinner et al v. New York Times Company Featured Case
Plaintiff: Brady Skinner and Wesley Luburgh
Defendant: New York Times Company
Case Number: 3:2008cv00011
Filed: January 16, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Walter H Rice
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2009 Filing 12 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney Marcy Croft. (davisj1, )
May 13, 2008 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Defendants New York Times Company, Michael Braga, Plaintiffs Brady Skinner, Wesley Luburgh (Dankof, Steven)
April 16, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: Preliminary Pretrial Telephone Conference re-set for 4/21/2008 at 08:30 AM before Judge Walter H Rice.(from 4/17/2008 at 08:45 AM ) (sc1, )
April 16, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: Preliminary Pretrial Telephone Conference re-set for 4/17/2008 at 08:45 AM before Judge Walter H Rice. (sc1, )
April 9, 2008 Filing 10 RULE 26(f) REPORT of Parties by Defendants New York Times Company, Michael Braga, Plaintiffs Brady Skinner, Wesley Luburgh. (Dankof, Steven)
March 19, 2008 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER SUSTAINING 7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 5/5/12008. Signed by Judge Walter H Rice on 3/19/2008. (sc1, )
March 10, 2008 Filing 9 (DELETED 3/19/08) NOTICE by Plaintiffs Brady Skinner, Wesley Luburgh of Service of First Set of Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents to Defendant The New York Times Co. (Dankof, Steven) Modified on 3/19/2008 - To delete - discovery rule (5) (sc1, ).
March 10, 2008 Filing 8 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Brady Skinner, Wesley Luburgh of Service of First Set of Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents Directed to Defendant Michael Braga (Dankof, Steven)
February 29, 2008 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 6 MOTION to Dismiss New date requested 5/5/2008. Plaintiffs by Plaintiff Brady Skinner. (Dankof, Steven)
February 12, 2008 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant New York Times Company. Responses due by 3/7/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E) (Lazear, Sherri)
February 7, 2008 NOTATION ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Louis Angelo Colombo. Signed by Walter H Rice on 01/31/08. (mkb1, )
January 30, 2008 Filing fee (PHV for Sherri Lazear): $ 200.00, receipt number COL1482 (kk2)
January 29, 2008 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sherri Blank Lazear (Filing fee $ 200) by Defendant New York Times Company. (Lazear, Sherri)
January 25, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings:Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/16/2008 at 8:30 AM by telephone before Walter H Rice. Prior to the pretrial conference counsel must comply with the MANDATORY DISCLOSURE RULES of Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) and the MANDATORY, pre-preliminary pretrial conference between counsel, required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). NOTE...the format for the Rule 26(f) conference between counsel and the Report to the court has been altered. This new form is available on line and MUST be utilized in this case. The Report must be filed 7 DAYS PRIOR TO THE CONFERENCE. In all cases with class action allegations, the parties shall include in their Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) report proposed deadlines for completing discovery relevant to those allegations and for filing a motion to certify a class, and a proposed date for class action determination. Pretrial procedures and forms can be found at our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov. Should more attorneys be actively involved than those listed on the Court's docket, please notify the Courtroom Deputy, Kelly Kopf, at 937-512-1500, immediately, to include the additional attorneys in the Preliminary Pretrial Conference. If you wish a number other than your office number called, please advise 24 hours preceding the conference. (kopf1, )
January 24, 2008 Filing 4 STIPULATION Notice of Filing Stipulated Extension to Move or Plead by Defendants New York Times Company, Michael Braga. (Lazear, Sherri)
January 17, 2008 Filing fee: $ 350.00, receipt number 300DAY416. (jcw)
January 16, 2008 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND filed by Brady Skinner and Wesley Luburgh against New York Times Company and Michael Braga, originally filed in Montgomery County Court of Common Pleas as Case Number 2007 CV 1868. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3). (jcw)
January 16, 2008 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by New York Times Company and Michael Braga from Montgomery County, case number 2007 CV 1868. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (jcw)
January 16, 2008 Filing 1 Civil Cover Sheet (jcw)
January 16, 2008 ...NOTICE, If case is to be referred, it will be Chief Magistrate Judge Merz. (phil1, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skinner et al v. New York Times Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brady Skinner
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Intili
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Luburgh
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Intili
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Times Company
Represented By: Sherri Blank Lazear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?