Miller v. Alza Corporation et al
Plaintiff: William Miller
Defendant: Alza Corporation, Novartis Phamaceuticals Corporation, Sandoz Inc, Sandoz Pharmaceuticals Corporation and John Does
Case Number: 3:2008cv00402
Filed: October 31, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED with regard to the following claims, which are dismissed: Plaintiff's Failure to Warn/Inadequate Warning Claim asserted; Plaintiff's claims of negligence and negligent misrepresentation; Plainitff's breach of warranty claims; Plaintiff's claims asserting fraud upon the FDA; and Plaintiff's request for punitive damages. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED in all other respects. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 12/17/10. (lk1)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE TO STATUS REPORT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 6/2/2010. (kpf1)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STATUS INQUIRY - Accordingly, the Magistrate Judge requests counsel to advise the Court in writing not later than June 1, 2010, of the status of preparation of this case for trial. In particular, do counsel expect to complete any case-specific discov ery by the cut-off of June 21, 2010? If not, what proposals do counsel have for completion of discovery? Do the parties still desire the entry of a protective order? The case remains set for trial to a jury on February 28, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 5/12/2010. (kpf1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Alza Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Miller
Represented By: James Craig Orr, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alza Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Phamaceuticals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?