Hilker v. Commissioner of SSA
Plaintiff: Todd Hilker
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Case Number: 3:2009cv00186
Filed: May 8, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Ovington
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 402 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 27 Motion for Attorney Fees. The Commissioner shall pay Plaintiff's attorney fees pursuant to 42 U.S.C. §406(b)(1) in the amount of $16,628.00; and the case remains terminated on the docket of this Court. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 7/7/11. (mr1)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ADOPTING 25 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 22 Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Todd Hilker. 1. Plaintiff's Motion For Attorney Fees Under Equal Access To Justice Act, 28 U.S.C.§2412(d) (Doc. 22 ) be GRANTED in the reduced amou nt of $5,230.88; 2. Plaintiff is granted an award of attorney fees under the EAJA in the amount of $5,230.88. 3. The Commissioner be directed to pay Plaintiff's EAJA award directly to his counsel of record; and 4. The case remain terminated on the docket of this Court. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 1/6/11. (lk1)
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 22 MOTION for Attorney Fees - IT IS THEREFORE RECOMMENDED THAT: 1. Plaintiff's Motion For Attorney Fees Under Equal Access To Justice Act, 28 U.S.C.§2412(d) (Doc. 22 ) be GRANTED in the reduced amount o f $5,230.88; 2. The Clerk of Court be directed to enter Judgment in favor of Plaintiff and against the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration in the total amount of $5,230.88. 3. The Commissioner be directed to pay Plaintiff;'s EAJA award directly to his counsel of record; and 4. The case remain terminated on the docket of this Court. Objections to R&R due by 12/20/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L Ovington on 12/3/10. (cib1)
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DECISION AND ENTRY: (1) ADOPTING THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE Doc. 15 IN ITS ENTIRETY; (2)OVERRULING DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Doc. 16 ; (3) VACATING THE COMMISSIONER'S DECISION THAT PLAINTIFF WAS NOT DISABLED; (4) REMANDING FOR JUDGMENT TO BE ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF AWARDING BENEFITS; AND (5) TERMINATING THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 7/8/10. (kje1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hilker v. Commissioner of SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Hilker
Represented By: Stephanie D Dobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?