Mills v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: William Mills
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2012cv00104
Filed: April 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: GREENE
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Ovington
Presiding Judge: Walter H Rice
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DECISION AND ENTRY - Accordingly, the Court hereby ORDERS that: 1. The Motion For Allowance Of Attorney Fees filed by Plaintiffs attorney (Doc. # 16 ) is GRANTED; 2. The Commissioner shall pay Plaintiffs attorney fees pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 40 6(b )(1) in the amount of $12,000.00; 3. Plaintiffs counsel shall refund to Plaintiff the amount of attorney fees, if any, he has actually received under the Equal Access To Justice Act (Doc. # 15 );and 4. The case remains terminated on the docket of this Court. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 5/8/2017. (srb)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DECISION AND ORDER - The Court hereby ORDERS that: 1. The parties] Stipulation To Award EAJA Fees (Doc. # 14 ) is accepted, and the Commissioner shall pay Plaintiffs attorney fees under 28 U.S.C. §2412 in the total amount of $3,600.00; 2. D efendant shall verify, within thirty days of this Decision and Order, whether or not Plaintiff owes a pre-existing debt to the United States subject to offset. If no such pre-existing debt exists, Defendant shall pay the EAJA award directly to Plaintiff; and 3. The case remains terminated on the docket of this Court. Signed by Judge Walter H Rice on 09/17/13. (pb1)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 JUDGMENT in favor of William Mills against Commissioner of Social Security. Notice of Disposal attached. Case Terminated. Signed on 6/18/13. (kje1)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 - IT IS THEREFORE RECOMMENDED THAT:1. The Commissioner's non-disability finding be vacated. 2. No finding be made as to whether Plaintiff William Mills was under a "disability" within the meaning of the Social Security Act. 3. This case be remanded to the Commissioner and the Administrative Law Judge under Sentence Four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) for further consideration consistent with this Report and Recommendations. 4. The case be terminated on the docket of this Court. Objections to R&R due by 6/14/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L Ovington on 5/28/13. (kje1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mills v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Mills
Represented By: Gary Marc Blumenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?