Lyons v. Secretary of the Air Force
Plaintiff: Bridget Lyons
Defendant: Secretary of the Air Force
Case Number: 3:2012cv00142
Filed: May 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: TERMINATION ENTRY - The Court having been advised that the above-captioned matter has been settled, IT IS ORDERED that this action is hereby DISMISSED, with prejudice as to all parties, providedthat any of the parties may, upon good cause shown within thirty (30) days, reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 1/6/2017. (ep)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ENTRY AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, DOC. 35 , AND TERMINATING CASE. Because Plaintiff has no direct evidence of discrimination and because Plaintiff cannot disprove Defendant's stated non-discriminatory reason s as pretext, and because the actions Plaintiff decries do not amount to a hostile work environment, Defendant's Motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. The captioned cause is hereby TERMINATED upon the docket records of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio, Western Division, at Dayton. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 12/3/14. (ep)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 15 Motion to Consolidate Cases 3:12-cv-142 and 3:13-cv-221 - Case Number 3:12-cv-142 will be the lead case in this action and all future pleadings shall be filed under number. In addition, case number 3:13-cv-221 is TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 08/29/13. (pb1)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENTRY AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S AMENDED MOTION TO STAY 7 . Defendant is ORDERED to file quarterly updates with the Court concerning the progress of the EEOC investigation. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 11/29/12. (ep)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lyons v. Secretary of the Air Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridget Lyons
Represented By: David Michael Duwel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of the Air Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?