Huelsman v. Lindeman

Plaintiff: Carl Edward Huelsman
Defendant: Robert J Lindeman
Case Number: 3:2012cv00268
Filed: August 3, 2012
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Dayton Office
County: MIAMI
Referring Judge: Michael R Merz
Presiding Judge: Walter H Rice
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 9, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - It is hereby ORDERED that the complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted under 42 U.S.C. § 1983. This case is TERMINATED on the docket of this Court. Signed by Judge Walter H Rice on 10/09/12. (pb1)(Huelsman)
October 9, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT with Attached Notice of Disposal. Signed on 10/09/12. (pb1)
August 24, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 8/24/2012. (kpf1)
September 18, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - Because the Complaint fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted under 42 U.S.C. § 1983, it should be dismissed without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 10/5/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 9/18/2012. (kpf1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huelsman v. Lindeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Edward Huelsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J Lindeman
Represented By: Gary A Nasal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.