Leesemann et al v. Lowes Home Centers,Inc et al

Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers Inc, John Doe, First Source Employee Management Inc and Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield
Plaintiff: Marietta Hail-Leesemann and Gregory H. Leesemann
Case Number: 3:2013cv00068
Filed: March 4, 2013
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Dayton Office
County: CLARK
Referring Judge: Sharon L Ovington
Presiding Judge: Walter H Rice
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 13, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (DOC. # 24 ) IN THEIR ENTIRETY; SUSTAINING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR REMAND (DOC. # 6 ); OVERRULING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR HEARING AS MOOT (DOC. # 23 ); DIRECTING CLERK OF COURT TO REMAND CASE TO CLARK COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS; TERMINATION ENTRY. Signed by Judge Walter H Rice on 09/13/13. (pb1)
August 26, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS denying as moot 23 MOTION for Hearing filed by Marietta Hail-Leesemann, Gregory H. Leesemann, and granting 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Marietta Hail-Leesemann, Gregory H. Leesemann. Objections to R&R due by 9/12/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L Ovington on 8/26/13. (slo1)
May 17, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The Court therefore ORDERS Plaintiffs to file, on or before May 31, 2013, a Motion to Amend their Complaint with their proposed AmendedComplaint attached. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L Ovington on 5/17/2013. (kf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leesemann et al v. Lowes Home Centers,Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers Inc
Represented By: Audrey K Bentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Source Employee Management Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marietta Hail-Leesemann
Represented By: J Pierre Tismo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory H. Leesemann
Represented By: J Pierre Tismo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?