Blair v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Kimberly Blair
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2013cv00105
Filed: April 8, 2013
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Dayton Office
County: MIAMI
Referring Judge: Michael J Newman
Presiding Judge: Walter H Rice
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 26, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (DOC. #18); SUSTAINING PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN EAJA AWARD (DOC. #17); AWARDING PLAINTIFF $3,573.00 IN EAJA FEES. Signed by Judge Walter H Rice on 3/26/2015. (srb1)
February 2, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 17 MOTION for Attorney Fees under EAJA filed by Kimberly Blair Objections to R&R due by 2/20/2015. Based upon the foregoing analysis, IT IS THEREFORE RECOMMENDED THAT: 1. Plaintiffs unopposed motion for a n EAJA fee award (doc. 17) be GRANTED; 2. Plaintiff be AWARDED the sum of $3,573.00 in EAJA fees; and 3. As no further matters remain pending for review, this case remain TERMINATED upon the Courts docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J Newman on 2/2/2015. (srb1)
August 14, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT with attached Notice of Disposal. Signed on 08/14/14. (pb1)
July 25, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION1 THAT: (1) THE ALJ'S NON-DISABILITY FINDING BE FOUND UNSUPPORTED BY SUBSTANTIAL EVIDENCE, AND REVERSED; (2) THIS MATTER BE REMANDED TO THE COMMISSIONER UNDER THE FOURTH SENTENCE OF 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) FOR PROCEEDIN GS CONSISTENT WITH THIS OPINION; (3) PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR A SENTENCE SIX REMAND BE DENIED; AND (4) THIS CASE BE CLOSED. re 7 , 9 , 12 Objections to R&R due by 8/11/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J Newman on 7/25/2014. (srb1)
June 11, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING MANAGEMENT OF SOCIAL SECURITY CASES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J Newman on 6/11/13. (kje1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blair v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Blair
Represented By: Gary Marc Blumenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?